Century Surety Company v. Mo Foods, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Century Surety Company
Defendant: Ruben Morales, Sean Caniloa, Neha Patel, Pradip Patel, TMPM, LLC, Manish Patel, Mo Foods, LLC, Wayne Penaranda, Deborah Penaranda and Patrick Penaranda
Case Number: 2:2013cv01387
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/10/14: 73 Bill of Costs is denied. (Kaminski, H)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 JUDGMENT AFTER ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT dated *5/16/14* pursuant to order signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/16/14.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 4/23/14 GRANTING 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall file a proposed judgment and a separate document explaining recoupment calculations and conclusions within 7 days. (Manzer, C)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 2/21/2014 denying defendants' 38 48 Motions to Stay. (Marciel, M)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/5/2013 ORDERING Motion to Stay hearing RESET for 1/13/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.; hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is RESET for 3/10/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. This Order MOOTS 34 Motion, therefore that Motion is DENIED. (Waggoner, D)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/2/2013 DENYING 35 Ex Parte Application for an order shortening time. (Donati, J)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/22/2013 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file a motion for entry of default judgment as to Defendant Ruben Morales before the Magistrate Judge within thirty (30) days of the date on which this Order i s filed. Defendants Mo Foods LLC and Manish Patel shall file the motion to stay on or before 11/30/2013, and shall be noticed for hearing on the Courts earliest available law and motion date. The status conference scheduled for hearing on 10/28/2013, is CONTINUED to 2/3/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Century Surety Company v. Mo Foods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Caniloa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neha Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pradip Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMPM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manish Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mo Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Penaranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Penaranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Penaranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Century Surety Company
Represented By: John E. Peer
Represented By: Hugh Douglas Galt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?