Steiner v. Verizon Wireless
Plaintiff: Mable Steiner
Defendant: Verizon Wireless
Case Number: 2:2013cv01457
Filed: July 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/16/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (ECF No. 44) is denied; The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on plaintiff and on the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cc USCA) (Becknal, R)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/15/2014 ORDERING 39 plaintiff's request to withdraw her prior consent to the undersigned's jurisdiction is DENIED. (Reader, L)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/14/14 ORDERING that Verizon Wireless' MOTION to DISMISS 29 is GRANTED. The action is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk shall vacate all dates and close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/17/2014 STRIKING 20 Fourth Amended Complaint; GRANTING 14 Motion to Dismiss with LEAVE TO AMEND along the terms outlined herein; ORDERING the plaintiff to file within twenty-eight (28) days, either a Fifth Amended Complaint, compliant with this order, or a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41 (a)(1)(A)(i); ORDERING Defendant Verizon Wireless to respond to the Fifth Amended Complaint twenty-eight (28) days thereafter. (Michel, G)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/17/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 8 motion for leave to amend her complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a third amended complaint in accordance with this order within 21 days. Pla intiff's 8 motion for an extension of time to complete service of process is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall complete service of process on any defendants named in her third amended complaint no later than 12/5/2013. (Kastilahn, A)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/25/2013 DENYING, without prejudice, plaintiff's 2 application to proceed IFP; within 28 days, plaintiff shall pay the filing fee or file an amended application to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steiner v. Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mable Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?