Betts v. CPS, et al.
Plaintiff: |
Alma Betts |
Defendant: |
CPS and Family Court Services |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv01486 |
Filed: |
July 24, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly J. Mueller |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 12, 2014 |
Filing
7
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/12/2014 recommending that this action be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b); and that the Clerk be directed to close this case and vacate all dates; 1 Comp laint filed by Alma Betts referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Any party may file objections to F&Rs within 14 days after being served. Failure to timely file objections may waive the right to appeal the District Court's order.(Waggoner, D)
|
January 6, 2014 |
Filing
6
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/3/14: The portion of the Order to Show Cause 4 requiring plaintiff to amend her pleading remains undischarged. Along with a copy of this order, the Clerk of the Court shall also mail plaintiff a copy of the order previously issued on August 9, 2013 3 . On or before February 6, 2014, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint. (Kaminski, H)
|
October 18, 2013 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/18/13 ORDERING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than 11/30/13 why this case should not be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute the action and failure to comply with th e court's 3 Order. On or before 11/30/13, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that addresses the issues raised in 3 the court's screening order. Plaintiff's failure to file the required writing and amended complaint shall c onstitute an additional ground for, and plaintiff's consent to, the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including a recommendation that plaintiff's case be involuntarily dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b) and Local Rules 110 and 183(a). (Meuleman, A)
|
August 9, 2013 |
Filing
3
ORDER granting plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/9/13. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff is granted 45 days from the entry of this order to file an amended complaint. Failure to timely file an amended complaint in accordance with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed, and may be construed as plaintiff's consent to such dismissal. (Kastilahn, A)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?