Alston v. County of Sacramento Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Eric Alston
Defendant: County of Sacramento Sheriff's Department, Correctional Health Services, Scott Jones, Douglas, Steed, Harrison, Bacoch, Outman, Mrozinski, Triplett, Gandhi, Grgich, Caramello, Ralston, Lunar, Willis, Brucker, Aragon, Roberts, Snyder, Grassman and Gil
Case Number: 2:2013cv01488
Filed: July 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/29/2017 GRANTING 32 Request to Seal. Defendants' 31 Confidential Settlement Conference Statement is SEALED. (Donati, J)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/25/2017 SETTING a Settlement Conference for 8/29/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney; DIRECTING the parties to submit confidential settlement conference statements to Magistrate Judge Delaney by 8/22/2017. (Michel, G.)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/27/2017 ORDERING that the 25 findings and recommendations are ADOPTED in full. The 17 motion to dismiss of defendants Bacoch, Carmello, County of Sacramento, Douglas, Gandhi, Grgich, Jones, and Steed is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (Zignago, K.)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/15/17 recommending that the motion to dismiss of defendants Bacoch, Carmello, County of Sacramento, Douglas, Gandhi, Grgich, Jones and Steed be granted in part and denied in part as follows: The claims against defendants in their official capacities be dismissed. All claims against defendant County of Sacramento be dismissed. The claims regarding the creation of, or failure to create, policies, practices and customs, and the claims of failure to train, against defendants Jones and Steed be dismissed. All claims against defendants Douglas and Bacoch be dismissed. This case proceed on plaintiffs claims of deliberate indifference and negligence against defendants Jones, Grgich, Steed, Gandhi, and Carmello, as described above. Motion 17 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/6/16 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed October 30, 2015, are adopted in full; this case shall proceed on plaintiff's deliberate indifference and negligence claims against defen dants County of Sacramento, Jones, Fitch, Douglas, Steed, Harrison, Bacoch, Gandhi, Grgich, Carmello, Doe 12, and Doe 13 in connection with their refusal to adhere to his medical "recommendation" or chrono stating he needed to be housed on a lower tier and avoid climbing stairs; Plaintiff's claims under the Americans with Disabilities Act are dismissed for failure to state a claim; the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over any state law claims except as stated herein; and this matter is referred back to the assigned Magistrate Judge for service of the second amended complaint on defendants as provided herein. (Becknal, R)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/29/2015 DIRECTING the Clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this case proceed on plaintiff's deliberate indifferen ce and negligence claims against defendants County of Sacramento, Jones, Fitch, Douglas, Steed, Harrison, Bacoch, Gandhi, Grgich, Carmello, Doe 12, and Doe 132 in connection with their refusal to adhere to his medical "recommendation" or chrono stating he needed to be housed on a lower tier and avoid climbing stairs; plaintiff's claims under the Americans with Disabilities Act be dismissed for failure to state a claim; the court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over any state law claims except as stated herein; and this matter be referred back to the assigned Magistrate Judge for service of the second amended complaint on defendants as provided herein. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/05/14 ordering plaintiff's amended complaint 7 is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a second amended complaint. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff the court's form for filing a civil rights action. (Plummer, M)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/3/13 ORDERING that 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMSISED with 30 days to file an amended complaint.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alston v. County of Sacramento Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrozinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gandhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grgich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caramello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lunar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?