Bartholomew v. Solorzano
Plaintiff: Kevin Bartholomew
Defendant: A.V. Solorzano
Case Number: 2:2013cv01500
Filed: July 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/15/2017 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Kevin Bartholomew at 1:00 p.m. on 10/12/2017 in Courtroom #1 before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court desk. (cc: Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison and OTCD) (Henshaw, R)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/31/17 ordering plaintiff shall file and serve his pretrial statement and any motions necessary to obtain the attendance of witnesses at trial on or before 11/14/17. Defendant shall file his pretr ial statement on or before 12/12/17. A pretrial conference is set in this case for 1/09/18 before the magistrate judge to be conducted on the file only without appearance by either party. ( Jury Trial set for 3/6/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before District Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.) (Plummer, M)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/24/2017; GRANTING 45 Motion for Extension of time; Plaintiff's objections are deemed timely filed; ADOPTING in FULL 43 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; This action to remain open. (Washington, S)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/3/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 32 motion to bifurcate defendant's opposition; and RECOMMENDING plaintiff's 28 motion for summary judgment be denied. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/11/15 ORDERING that Defendant's motion to compel discovery responses (ECF No. 23 ) is granted. Within 21 days of service of this order, plaintiff shall serve defendant with responses to de fendants interrogatories, set one, nos. 1 and 2. Plaintiff must respond to the interrogatories completely and without objection. Within 21 days of service of this order, plaintiff shall serve defendant with a copy of the document referenced in his responses to defendants requests for production, set one, nos. 4 and 5. Plaintiff may not interpose an objection to the provision of the referenced document. The August 29, 2014 discovery and scheduling order is hereby amended as follows: All pre trial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before November 30, 2015. Discovery in this case is closed, except that defendant may bring a further motion to compel discovery responses and/or motion for discovery sanctions if plaintiff fails to respond properly to this order.(Dillon, M)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/11/14 granting 24 Motion to modify the discovery and scheduling order. A modified discovery and scheduling order shall issue after this court rules on defendant's pending motion to compel. (Plummer, M)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kevin Bartholomew signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/21/14. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Kaminski, H)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/28/13 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, either the $350.00 filing fee or a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided with this order; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner for use in a civil rights action.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartholomew v. Solorzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bartholomew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.V. Solorzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?