Mammen et al v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Robin Mammen, Larry Mammen and A. P.
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Renae Rodocker, Luis Villa, Debbie Williams, Stephanie Lynch, Community Care Licensing, Brenda Chaney, Jeff Wells, Michelle Wong, Jack Daniels, Dana Peters and Rey Carboni
Case Number: 2:2013cv01588
Filed: August 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 AMENDED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/24/18. Trial briefs may be E-filed with the court no later than 5/14/18. The joint set of jury instructions shall be lodged on or before 5/14/18. In limine motions shall be E-filed separately on or before 5/11/18. Opposition briefs shall be E-filed on or before 5/16/18. A Settlement Conference is SET for 5/3/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Trial will commence on or about 5/21/2018, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom (6) (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. The parties estimate six (6) to seven (7) court days for trial. (Kastilahn, A)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/6/2017 ORDERING the Close of Phase 2 Discovery is EXTENDED to 11/9/2017. (Washington, S)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/29/2017 ORDERING Expert Disclosure due by 8/8/2017; Supplemental Expert Disclosure due by 8/22/2017; Close of Phase 2 Discovery due by 9/22/2017; Dispositive Motion, Phase 2 by 10/10/2017, Hearing of Dispositive Motions, Phase 2, set for 11/7/2017 at 1:30; Joint Pretrial Statement due by 12/1/2017; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; and Trial set for 1/8/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Reader, L)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/8/2017 ORDERING that Pretrial Scheduling Order is MODIFIED as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 7/8/2017; Supplemental expert witness disclosure due by 7/29/2017; Completion of phase II discovery due by 9/1/2017; Dispositive Motions due by 10/19/2017; Phase II dispositive motions due by 10/10/2017; The hearing for phase II motions moved to 11/7/2017 at 1:30 PM. (Zignago, K.)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/25/17. The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendants' MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 80 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/22/16 GRANTING Defendant County of Sacramento's Request to Seal documents in support of County Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/21/2016 ORDERING Close of Phase 1 Discovery: Discovery due by 11/21/2016; Dispositive Motions Phase 1, filed by 12/21/2016, Hearing of Dispositive Motions, Phase 1, 1/24/2017 at 1:30 PM; Expert Discl osure due by 6/8/2017; Supplemental Expert Disclosure by 6/29/2017; Close of Phase 2 Discovery: Discovery due by 7/24/2017; Dispositive Motion, Phase 2, due 8/22/2017, Hearing of Dispositive Motions, Phase 2, 9/19/2017 at 1:30 PM; Joint Pretrial Stat ement due by 12/1/2017; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; and Trial set for 1/8/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Reader, L)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER TO MODIFY PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 07/11/16 ORDERING the following dates are RESET as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/17/16 with any supplemental/rebuttal expert disclosures due by 10/31/16; Discovery completed by 11/21/16; all Dispositive Motions filed by 12/21/16 and heard 01/24/17 at 1:30 p.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 06/09/17 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A . Mendez with a joint pretrial statement due 06/02/17; Jury Trial set for 07/17/17 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez; Settlement Conference set for 9/9/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney (cc: CKD). (Benson, A)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/16/16. (Becknal, R)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/20/2016 MODIFYING the 60 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order; ORDERING that expert witnesses be disclosed by 7/15/2016 and that supplemental expert witnesses be disclosed by 7/29/201 6; ORDERING that all discovery be completed by 9/16/2016; ORDERING that dispositive motions be filed by 10/18/2016 and that said motions be heard on 11/15/2016 at 01:30 PM; ORDERING that the Joint Pretrial Statement be filed by 1/6/2017; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference 1/13/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez; CONTINUING the Jury Trial 2/13/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Michel, G.)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/8/14. The Court GRANTS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND Defendant CCL's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's fourth and fifth causes of action 51 . As Defendant CCL is not named in any of the remaining causes of action in Plaintiffs' TAC, the matter will proceed without Defendant CCL. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER 47 setting deadline and extending time signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/17/2014. Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before 6/30/2014 and submission of Joint Case Management Statement shall be postponed until 30 days after Court rules on Motion directed at Third Amended Complaint, or if no Motion is filed, 30 days after State Defendants file an Answer to Third Amended Complaint. (Marciel, M)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/6/14 GRANTING 40 Motion to Dismiss; the Court DISMISSES WITH LEAVE TO AMEND: Plaintiffs fourth cause of action for discrimination and retaliation; Plaintiffs fifth cause of action for discrimination an d retaliation; and Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Wong in her individual capacity. The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE but WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND in this action, Plaintiffs seventh cause of action for violation of 42 U.S.C. § 1985 against CCL and Defendant Wong in her official capacity for damages. State Defendants attorneys are hereby ordered to pay $150 in sanctions within 10 days of the date of this order. (Dillon, M)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/8/14 ORDERING that the Parties' time to submit the Joint Case Management Statement is EXTENDED until 6/20/2014 thirty (30) days after the 5/21/14 Motion to Dismiss hearing, pursuant to Local Rule 144(a). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/27/14: Defendants' time to serve and file a response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint shall be extended from March 28, 2014 to April 18, 2014 pursuant to Local Rule 144(a). (Kaminski, H)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/5/14 GRANTING joint stipulation. Plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint by 3/14/14. 27 and 28 Motions to Dismiss are withdrawn. (Manzer, C)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/11/13: Defendants' time to serve and file a response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint shall be extended from December 21, 2013 to January 9, 2014. (Kaminski, H)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/9/13. County Defendants' request for an extension of time, up to and including December 23, 2013, in which to answer, move, or otherwise plead as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, is granted. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mammen et al v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Mammen
Represented By: Dennise Suzanne Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Mammen
Represented By: Dennise Suzanne Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. P.
Represented By: Dennise Suzanne Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renae Rodocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Care Licensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rey Carboni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?