Bjork v. County of Placer District Attorney's Office
Plaintiff: Karin Bjork
Defendant: County of Placer District Attorney's Office
Case Number: 2:2013cv01616
Filed: August 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED 11 Stipulated Supplemental Protective Court Order Regarding Private and Confidential Documents for Third-Party Witness signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/2/16. (Becknal, R)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/23/2015 GRANTING 21 Plaintiff's Motions to Consolidate, and the two cases will proceed as a single action. Case 2:14CV1983 MCE EFB is designated as the "master fil e." Not later than 30 days following the date this Order of Consolidation is electronically filed, Plaintiff is directed to file a Consolidated Complaint encompassing all claims she asserts against Defendants. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close Case 2:13CV1616 MCE EFB. The pretrial scheduling order currently in effect is VACATED, and Defendant 20 County's Motion to Vacate and/or Modify Pretrial Scheduling Order is thus DENIED as moot. County's 21 Moti on to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to being refiled following submission of the Consolidated Complaint. Finally, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report for scheduling purposes in Case 2:14CV1983 MCE EFB not later than 60 days following the date a Consolidated Complaint is filed. CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED (Reader, L)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/12/2014 ORDERING that cases 213-cv-1616 MCE EFB and 2:14-cv-1983 TLN EFB are RELATED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to reassigned 2:14-cv-1983 to Chief Judge England. (Donati, J)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Private and Confidential Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/8/14. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bjork v. County of Placer District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin Bjork
Represented By: Jill P. Telfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Placer District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?