Thomas v. Swarthout
Petitioner: Lloyd M. Thomas
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Case Number: 2:2013cv01645
Filed: August 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/19/14 ordering petitioner's application for writ of habeas corpus is denied. This case is closed. the court declines to issue the certificate of appealability. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/20/13 granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. The time for filing respondent's responsive pleading is extended through and including 12/11/13. Petitioner's request for entry of default 13 is denied. (Plummer, M)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/2/13 ORDERING that 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED without prejudice; Petitioners request for production of competency proceeding transcripts 11 is denied.(Dillon, M)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/14/13 ordering the clerk of the court shall send petitioner the court's form application for writ of habeas corpus by state prisoners. Petitioner is granted 21 days within which to file a signed application for writ of habeas corpus. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lloyd M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?