Wright v. Thirfty Payless, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Wright
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation, Thrifty Payless, Inc. and Tim Henderson
Case Number: 2:2013cv01681
Filed: August 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/7/2015 FINDING that the relevant factors in this matter weigh against remand; DETERMINING that the court will continue to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over this case; DISCHARGING 44 Order to Show Cause. (Michel, G)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/16/2014 ORDERING the parties are hereby ORDERED, within seven (7) days of entry of this order, to show cause why this court should not decline to exercise its discretion and retain supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims, but rather remand the case to state court.(Reader, L)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/14/2013 4 Motion to Dismiss fifth and sixth causes of action is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint consistent with this order. (Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Thirfty Payless, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Thomas K. Hockel
Represented By: Sweta H Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless, Inc.
Represented By: Sweta H Patel
Represented By: Thomas K. Hockel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Wright
Represented By: Samuel K Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?