Williams-Carter et al v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sheila Williams-Carter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2013cv01744
Filed: August 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/02/2017 DENYING Plaintiff's 42 Motion to Reopen Case. No further motions or requests for reconsideration will be entertained in this closed case. (Jackson, T)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 27 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's 32 cross-motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is entered for the Commissioner. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/13/14 ORDERING that Within seven (7) days of this order, the Commissioner shall file a brief statement advising the court whether or not it stipulates to a voluntary remand of the action.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/06/14 ordering plaintiff shall file a written respons to plaintiff's counsel's motion to withdraw no later than 07/07/14. The response shall indicate whether or not plaintiff consen ts to withdrawal of plaintiff's counsel, and if not, the reasons therefor. Alternatively, if plaintiff does not wish for her case to be pursued at this juncture, she may file a statement consenting to dismissal of the action without prejudice n o later than 07/07/14. The briefing deadlines in this action are temporarily suspended. The court will issue a further order concerning briefing deadlines after resolution of the pending motion to withdraw. The clerk of the court shall serve a cop y of this order on plaintiff herself at the last-known address for plaintiff provided by plaintiff's counsel in the proof of service of the motion to withdraw: Sheila Williams-Carter, 730 31st Street, Oakland, California, 94609. Plaintiff' s counsel shall also use his best efforts to attempt to provide plaintiff with notice of this order through any e-mail address or telephone number for plaintiff that plaintiff's counsel may have. (Copy of this order served by mail on plaintiff at 730 31st Street, Oakland, CA 94609)(Plummer, M)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/22/14: Plaintiff shall have a second extension of time of (45) days up through and including Monday, June 9, 2014 in which to e-file her Motion for Summary Judgment. Defend ant shall file any opposition, including cross-motions, on or before July 9, 2014. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded to comply with all requirements of Local Rule 182 and other applicable law with respect to future withdrawal or substitution of counsel. (Kaminski, H)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/7/14 that Plaintiff shall have a first extension of time of (14) days up through and including Monday, April 21, 2014 in which to e-file her Motion for Summary Judgment; and Defendant shall file any opposition, including cross-motions, on or before May 21, 2014. (Becknal, R)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/26/13 GRANTING 1 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall submit an original and 5 copies of the summons, complaint, scheduling order and a completed USM-285 form to the USM within 14 days; plaintiff shall also submit a statement to the Court that submission of documents was made. The USM is directed to serve process within 60 days. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams-Carter et al v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Williams-Carter
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?