Coleman v. Foulk, et al
Plaintiff: Saadhi Abdul Coleman
Defendant: Fred Foulk, T. Swartz, P. Arnwald, M. Hanned, K. Teliya, A. C. Davis, G. Hale, C. Nelson and Ron Barnes
Case Number: 2:2013cv01753
Filed: August 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/30/18 GRANTING 70 Request for approval of substitution of counsel. Attorney Peter J. Hirsig added and Attorney Justin W. Walker terminated as counsel of record for defendant G. Hale. (Coll, A)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/08/18 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Saahdi Coleman on 10/18/18 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: KJN and OTCD) (Plummer, M)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/1/18 granting in part and denying in part 54 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Defendants Swartz and Harrod are dismissed. Plaintiff's third amended complaint states a cognizable claim for relief against defendants Hale and Nelson as reflected in this order. This matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Kaminski, H)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/16/2017 GRANTING 57 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff granted 14 days from the date of this order in which to file and serve his objections. (Henshaw, R)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/25/2017 ORDERING defendants Davis, Terry and Arnswald file their response to plaintiff's 53 third amended complaint within 21 days; and RECOMMENDING defendants Swartz, Harold, Hale and Nelson be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/03/17 ordering plaintiff's second amended complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days to file a third amended complaint. No defendant need take any further action until receiving further direction from the court. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff a copy of the document filed by plaintiff on 03/16/16 46 . (Plummer, M)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/08/16 ordering Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a second amended complaint 41 is granted.Plaintiffs first amended complaint is dismissed.Defendants motion to dismiss 33 is denied without prejudice.Defendants motion to strike 45 is denied. Defendants need not take any further action with respect to this matter until notified by the court that action is required. (Plummer, M) Modified on 6/8/2016 (Plummer, M).
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/1/2015 ADOPTING IN PART 18 Findings and Recommendations; DISMISSING Defendants California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Ron Barnes, Fred Foulk; REFERRING this matter back to Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Michel, G.)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/17/2014 ORDERING that service is appropriate for P. Arnwald, M. Hanned, T. Swartz, K Tenya; the Clerk shall send plaintiff forms for service to be complete d and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission; and the Clerk shall assign a district court judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING that all defendants other than Swartz, Arnwald, Hanned and Tenya be dismissed. Assigned and Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/30/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 15 request for an extension of time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint within 30 days of this order. Failure to file an amended complaint within 30 days will result in dismissal of this action. (Kastilahn, A)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/26/2014 GRANTING plaintiff's 7 request to proceed IFP; plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent CDCR order; plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED; and plaintiff has 30 days, to file an amended complaint. (Yin, K)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/26/13 DENYING 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/27/13 dismissing 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Foulk, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saadhi Abdul Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Foulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Arnwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hanned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Teliya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?