Quigley v. American Claims Services, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: |
Carol Quigley |
Defendant: |
American Claims Services, Inc., John Bannon, Susan B. Johnson and Bill T. Johnson |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv01766 |
Filed: |
August 26, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Placer |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly J. Mueller |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 8, 2015 |
Filing
129
PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/5/2015. [parties' Witness and Exhibits Lists attached] (Marciel, M)
|
March 19, 2015 |
Filing
95
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/18/2015. (Zignago, K.)
|
March 18, 2015 |
Filing
94
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/18/2015. Defendants' 51 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to defendants' statutes of limitations argument, as to plaintiff's conversion and misappropriation claims, and as to plai ntiff's Request for Punitive Damages. The 51 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in favor of defendants Bill Johnson and Sue Johnson as to plaintiff's vicarious liability theory and in favor of all defendants as to plaintiff's UCL claim. (Marciel, M)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing
92
ORDER AFTER HEARING signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on March 12, 2015. Defendants motion 77 is GRANTED as to plaintiffs Request for Production of Documents, requests numbers 4-8, but only as to financial documents related to accounts maintained solely by Margaret Bannon. The motion in all other respects is DENIED. Defendants shall produce documents responsive to plaintiffs discovery requests, with the exception of Mrs. Bannons financial documents, within 14 days of the date of this order. Furthermore, the parties shall file with the court within 7 days a stipulation and proposed protective order governing the disclosure of responsive documents. (Rivas, A)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing
58
ORDER denying 38 Motion for partial Summary Judgment signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/5/14. (Kaminski, H)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing
57
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/5/14 ORDERING that defendant's MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER 31 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
April 25, 2014 |
Filing
28
STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/24/14: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 12/9/2014. Discovery due by 7/31/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/27/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2015 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Jury Trial set for 7/13/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
|
April 2, 2014 |
Filing
25
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/1/14 ORDERING All Confidential Information designated as "CONFIDENTIAL" shall not be disclosed by the receiving party to anyone other than those persons designa ted herein and shall be handled in the manner set forth herein and, in any event, shall not be used for any purpose other than in connection with this litigation, unless and until such designation is removed either by written agreement of Counsel or by order of the Court. (Becknal, R)
|
January 23, 2014 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/22/2014 DENYING 4 Motion to Dismiss the plaintiff's five causes of action based on the applicable statute of limitations; DENYING 4 Motion to Dismiss the plaintiff's claim for violation of California's Business and Professional Code section 17200; DENYING 4 Motion to Dismiss the plaintiff's fraud cause of action as applied to defendants John Bannon and ACS; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 4 Motion to Dismiss the plaintiff' s First Amended Complaint under Rule 9(b); GRANTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 4 Motion to Dismiss the plaintiff's fraud cause of action as applied to defendants Bill T. Johnson and Susan B. Johnson; GRANTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 4 Motion to Dismiss the plaintiff's breach of fiduciary duty cause of action; GRANTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 4 Motion to Dismiss the plaintiff's infringement of license claim; ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint within twenty-one (21) days. (Michel, G)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?