Rosales Aniceto v. Foulk
Petitioner: Ismael Rosales Aniceto
Respondent: Foulk
Case Number: 2:2013cv01819
Filed: September 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/18/2017 DENYING 15 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The court declines to issue the certificate of appealability. CASE CLOSED. (Henshaw, R)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/15/2014 DISREGARDING the 1/7/2014 19 decline to consent form; and the Clerk shall remove the district judge assignment. (Yin, K)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/8/2013 GRANTING petitioner's 11 motion for an extension of time; petitioner shall file the petition for writ of habeas corpus on or before 11/9/2013; and GRANTING petitioner's 8 motion to proceed IFP. (Yin, K)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/9/2013 APPOINTING the Federal Defender to represent petitioner; the Clerk shall serve a copy of the 9/3/2013 motion and this order on David M. Porter; counsel shall file a petition for writ of h abeas corpus no later than 30 days, and advise the court whether additional time is required prior to service on respondent; petitioner shall submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the $5.00 filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp application at his address of record in Susanville, CA. (cc: David Porter) (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales Aniceto v. Foulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ismael Rosales Aniceto
Represented By: Jennifer Mikaere Sheetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Foulk
Represented By: Caely Erin Fallini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?