Booth v. Thermacor Process Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Frank M. Booth, Inc.
Defendant: Thermacor Process Inc., Thermacor Process, L.P., Thermacor, L.C., Richard B. Bender, II and Joe Keyes
Case Number: 2:2013cv01831
Filed: September 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/2/2017 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41; each party to bear their own fees and costs. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/23/16 ORDERING that the Trial Date of 9/19/16, the Discovery Completion and Disclosure of Expert Witness dates of 8/12/16, and all related dates are hereby VACATED. A new trial will be set, if necessary, upon completion of the State Court Action. Not later than 1/2/17, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report. (Jackson, T)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/10/2016 ORDERING that the Discovery Completion and Disclosure of Expert Witness date is CONTINUED to 8/12/2016. (Zignago, K.)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/5/2015 ORDERING the parties to disclose expert witnesses by 2/28/2016; CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 9/19/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. E ngland, Jr.; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 7/28/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that the Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement be filed by 7/7/2016; ORDERING that trial briefs be filed by 7/14/2016; ORDERING that any evidentiary or procedural motions be filed by 7/7/2016; ORDERING that oppositions be filed by 7/14/2016; ORDERING that any replies be filed by 7/21/2016. (Michel, G.)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/8/2015 ORDERING that the Discovery Completion and Disclosure of Expert Witness date of 7/7/2015 is CONTINUED to 9/30/2015. (Zignago, K.)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/9/2015 MODIFYING the 26 Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order; ORDERING that discovery be completed by 7/7/2015; ORDERING that all other dates in the 26 Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order remain unchanged. (Michel, G.)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/23/2015 VACATING the 3/5/2015 Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Drozd. Parties are ORDERED to file a status report one week after the private mediation, currently scheduled for 4/17/2015. (Donati, J)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/3/14 ORDERING that all Discovery shall be completed by 5/7/2015; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 7/7/2015; the last day to hear dispositive motions sh all be 11/12/2015; the Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 1/21/2006 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., with a joint final pretrial conference statement due by 12/30/2015; trial briefs are due by 1/7/2016 ; any evidentiary or procedural motions due by 12/30/2015, oppositions due by 1/7/2016 and any reply due by 1/14/2016; A Jury Trial is SET for 3/7/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., and is estimated t o last seven days. The Settlement Conference is SET for 3/5/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Each party is directed to submit to the chambers of Judge Dale A. Drozd confidential settlement conference statements not later than 2/26/2015. (Kastilahn, A)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/4/2014 GRANTING the parties' request to amend the dates within the 22 Pretrial Scheduling Scheduling Order re 23 Stipulation and Proposed Order; VACATING the 22 Pretrial Scheduling Order; INFORMING the parties that an amended scheduling order will follow. (Michel, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booth v. Thermacor Process Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermacor Process Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermacor Process, L.P.
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermacor, L.C.
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Bender, II
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Keyes
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank M. Booth, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan William Klotsche
Represented By: Sean-Thomas P. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?