Gregoire v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: David W Gregoire
Defendant: County of Sacramento, County of Sacramento Sheriff's Department, Scott Jones and Anthony Jenkins
Case Number: 2:2013cv01857
Filed: September 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/5/17 ORDERING that Defendant SHERIFF SCOTT JONES, in his official capacity is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice from all claims by Plaintiff pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). Each party will bear his or her own costs and attorneys fees.(Becknal, R)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 09/21/2017 GRANTING 75 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint FORTHWITH. (Donati, J)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 01/22/16 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's motion for summary judgment as to Count I for Excessive Force against Defendant Jenkins is DENIED. Defendant's motion for summary judgment as to Count II against Defendants Sacramento County, County of Sacramento Sheriff's Department, and Sheriff Scott Jones in his official capacity is GRANTED. (Jackson, T)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/21/14 ORDERING pursuant to stipulation, it is ordered that the last day for hearing dispositive motions is January 15, 2015. All other dates shall remain the same. (Becknal, R)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/6/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 35 Third Amended 34 to Compel further responses to Discovery Requests and DROPPING it from Court's 10/10/2014. Denial of plaintiff's Motion to Compel is WITHOUT PREJUDICE to re-filing only if Discovery is further extended by court Order. (Marciel, M)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/2/14 re: 37 ORDERING that defendants shall have 21 days from the date this order is signed to complete the deposition of Plaintiff's expert (Mr. Bogardus), and 21 days to file a motion to compel, if necessary. There are no other changes to the scheduling order. (Meuleman, A)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/17/14 GRANTING 30 Motion for Relief. Defendants' designation of expert witnesses is timely. (Manzer, C)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/8/2014 ORDERING that the parties complete all discovery including expert discovery by 10/1/2014, and exchange Expert Witness Reports by 8/1/2014. (Zignago, K.)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/11/2014 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file amended complaint. The first amended complaint shall be filed within ten (10) days after this stipulation and order is signed by the Court and electronically served on all parties. (Zignago, K.)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR DISCOVERY signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/8/14 re: 13 . (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregoire v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W Gregoire
Represented By: Gary William Gorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: John A. Lavra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento Sheriff's Department
Represented By: John A. Lavra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Represented By: John A. Lavra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Jenkins
Represented By: John A. Lavra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?