Clark v. Herrera et al
Plaintiff: Quinterrious Clark
Defendant: M. Herrera, S. Zavalas, Ellis, Weber, Kaiser, Scopello, A. Purcell and Hilliard
Case Number: 2:2013cv01885
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/05/18 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/29/17, ORDERING that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file any notice that he withdraws his motion to dismiss along with an explanation for his failure to file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment. If plaintiff chooses not to file a notice or if the court finds plaintiff's explanation insufficient, the court will recommend this action be dismissed without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/15/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff shall file an opposition to the 33 Motion for Summary Judgment within 14 days of the date of this order. (Hunt, G)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/5/2017 ORDERING, within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the 33 motion for summary judgment. (Yin, K)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/15/17 granting 31 Motion to modify the discovery and scheduling order. The discovery cut-off is extended by thirty days, up to and including 3/26/17, for the sol purpose of allowing defendant to depose plaintiff. (Plummer, M)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/21/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion for an extension of time 17 is granted; Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order in which to file an amended complaint; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff the courts form for filing a civil rights action.(Dillon, M)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/11/14 denying 15 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Within 30 days of the date of service of this order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that complies with this court's 08/05/14 screening order 9 , the Civil Rights ACt, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local rules of Practice. (Plummer, M)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/24/14 ORDERING that the courts September 19, 2014, findings and recommendations are vacated; Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint.(Dillon, M)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/18/14 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/05/14 granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be paid in accordance with the court's CDC o rder filed concurrently herewith. Plaintiff's complaint and supplemental complaints 1 , 5 and 8 are dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff the court's form for filing a civil rights action. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Herrera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinterrious Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Zavalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scopello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?