Conservation Congress v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Conservation Congress
Defendant: United States Forest Service and United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 2:2013cv01977
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/22/20 WITHDRAWING Motions for Attorney Fees 151 , 192 . Settlement Agreement between Plaintiff and Federal Defendants has been duly executed by their authorized legal representatives. (Kaminski, H)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 FIFTH STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/15/2020 STAYING Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and until 1/22/2020. If the parties have not resolved the issue of fees and costs by 1/22/20, they shall jointly inform the Court and shall propose to the Court a schedule for briefing Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs pursuant to Local Rule 293. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/06/19 STAYING Plaintiff's motion for attorneys fees and costs until 01/15/20. If the parties have not resolved the issue of fees and costs by 01/15/20, they shall jointly inform the Court and shall propose to the Court a schedule for briefing Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. (Benson, A.)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/18/2019 APPROVING 197 Stipulation. The parties shall report to the Court as soon as they have resolved the fee and cost issue. If they have not resolved the issue by 12/16/2019, they shall so inform the Court and propose a schedule for the briefing of Plaintiff's motion. (Huang, H)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/7/19 STAYING the Briefing on Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees and costs until 10/31/19. If the parties have not resolved the issue of fees and costs by 10/31/19, they shall jointly inform the Court and shall propose to the Court a schedule for briefing Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs pursuant to Local Rule 293. (Becknal, R)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/16/2018 DENYING 175 Motion to Stay. (Washington, S)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/2/2018 GRANTING 162 Motion to Amend the Judgment to Dissolve the Injunction. (Washington, S)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/18/2017 ORDERING: Plaintiff's Response due by 2/2/2018; Federal Defendant's Reply due by 1/16/2018; Intervenor-Defendant's Reply due by 1/16/2018; Reply Briefs due by 2/16/2018; and Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Hunt, G)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/19/2017 ORDERING the 151 Motion for Attorney Fees is STAYED. (Washington, S)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 FINAL JUDGMENT signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/26/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/21/2017 ORDERING that the the briefing schedule re 125 Amended Memorandum Brief is as follows: Federal Defendants' Response Brief due 3/23/2017; Defendant-Intervenor's Response Brief due 3/30/2017; Plaintiff's Reply Brief due 4/17/2017. (Zignago, K.)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/17/2017 GRANTING 122 Motion for 6-Day Extension of Time; ORDERING the plaintiff to file its opening brief by 2/27/2017; ORDERING the federal defendants to file a response brief by 3/20/2017; ORDERING Trinity River Lumber Company to file a response brief by 3/27/2017; ORDERING the plaintiff to file any reply brief by 4/10/2017. (Michel, G.)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/16/2017 ORDERING that the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's 103 Motion for Summary Judgment on the First Claim for Relief (Failure to Take a Hard Look) and the Fourth Claim for Relief (Failure to Develop a Reasonable Range of Alternatives) of the Second Amended Complaint. ECF No. 65. The Court DENIES the motion with respect to the remaining Claims for Relief and thus GRANTS 106 Defendants' and 109 Intervenor's Cross Motions fo r Summary Judgment on the Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, Eighth, and Ninth Claims for Relief, and the Supplemental Complaint, ECF No. 102. The Court will issue a separate Order regarding the relief/remedy to be imposed after receipt and consideration of the parties' supplemental briefs on this issue. (Jackson, T)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/5/16 ORDERING that Defendants' 107 Motion to Strike is GRANTED. The hearing on 109 , 106 , 103 Motions for Summary Judgment is RESET for 1/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/21/16 ORDERING that the briefing schedule on the 103 106 109 Motions for Summary Judgment and the 107 Motion to Strike all set for hearing 12/13/16 at 1:30 p.m. is MODIFIED as follows: plaintiff's Combined Opposition/Reply(30 pages)due 10/17/16; Federal defendants' Reply (15 pages) due 11/02/16; Defendant-Intervenor's Reply (10 pages) due 11/02/16. (Benson, A)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/20/16 GRANTING 100 Motion for leave to amend. Conservation Congress to file a Supplemental Complaint. (Washington, S)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION and ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/24/16. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (not to exceed 30 pages) deadline is 7/29/2016. Federal Defendants' Opposition and Cross- Motion for Summary Judgment (30 pages) deadline is 9/9/2016. Defendant-Intervenor's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (20 pages) deadline is 9/16/2016. Plaintiff's Combined Opposition/Reply (30 pages) deadline is 10/03/16; Federal Defendants Reply (15 pages) deadline is 10/19/16; Defendant-Intervenor's Reply (10 pages) deadline is 10/19/16. Motion Hearing New date is 12/13/2016 at 01:30 PM. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/27/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff Conservation Congress' 89 first ex parte motion is GRANTED. Each of the merits briefing deadlines set out in the Court's order 78 are EXTENDED by a period of two months. The new date for hearing on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment shall be 11/1/2016 at 1:30 P.M. (Kastilahn, A)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 02/19/16 ORDERING the following briefing schedule set: Federal Defendants and Defendant-Intervenor file their opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Regarding Scope of Review: 03/21/16; Pla intiff files its reply to its Motion for Order Regarding Scope of Review: 03/28/16; Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Order Regarding Scope of Review: 04/05/16; Plaintiff files its Motion for Summary Judgment: 05/06/16; Federal Defendants file their combined Opposition: 06/10/16; Defendant-Intervenor files its combined Opposition: 06/17/16; Plaintiff files its single combined Reply and Opposition: 07/01/16; Federal Defendants and Defendant-Intervenor file their Replies: 07/15/16; Hearing on Cross-Motions: 8/23/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 01/29/15 APPROVING 74 Stipulation. The deadline for Plaintiff's record motion shall be EXTENDED by one week until and through February 5, 2016 and the deadline for the associated Joint Status Report shall be EXTENDED by one week until and through February 12, 2016. (Jackson, T)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/3/2015 GRANTING 59 Motion to Intervene. (Michel, G.)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/30/2015 ORDERING case STAYED. (Zignago, K.)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/9/15 ORDERING that the Motion for Extension of time to file joint Status Report 39 is GRANTED. The deadline for the parties' joint Status Report is 3/25/2015. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/18/15 ORDERING that the Federal Defendants' 37 Motion for an Extension of Time to file their response or answer to plaintiff's amended complaint is GRANTED. The deadline for the Federal Defendants to respond or answer the Amended Complaint is 3/18/2015. (Kastilahn, A)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/20/15 GRANTING 25 Motion to Amend the Case Management Schedule. Plaintiff shall have until and through 2/4/15 in which to file its First Amended Complaint in this action; and Federal Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint within 28 days of the filing of the First Amended Complaint; and the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report within 35 days of the filing of the First Amended Complaint. (Meuleman, A)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/6/13. CASE STAYED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/3/13: The deadline for the parties to confer and submit the joint status report currently due on December 2, 2013 is extended until December 30, 2013.(Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conservation Congress v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservation Congress
Represented By: James Jay Tutchton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?