Porraz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lisa Gail Porraz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2013cv01995
Filed: September 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/18/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff is AWARDED attorney fees under the EAJA in the amount of $6,000.00. (Kastilahn, A)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/16/2015. Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and Commissioner's 16 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. This action is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with Sentence 4 of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Judgment entered for plaintiff. (Marciel, M)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/30/2014 ORDERING that the parties request for extension of time is hereby APPROVED, and plaintiff's time to reply to defendant's cross motion for summary judgment shall be on or before 7/18/2014.(Reader, L)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/24/14 re: 13 APPROVING Plaintiff's request to file her motion for summary judgment on or before 5/5/14. (Meuleman, A)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/1/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. Within 14 days Plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted. (cc: USM) (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porraz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Gail Porraz
Represented By: Shellie Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?