Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. JDS Builders Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Defendant: JDS Builders Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02228
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/27/2014 GRANTING the 17 Ex Parte Application for the extension of certain deadlines; ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Default Judgment by 5/1/2014; ALTERNATIVELY ORDERING the plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing by 5/1/2014, as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure of prosecution. (Michel, G)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 2/26/2014 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Default Judgment, noticed before the Magistrate Judge, within thirty days; ALTERNATIVELY ORDERING the plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing, by 3/31/2 014, as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure of prosecution; CONTINUING the Status Conference to 8/18/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; ORDERING that a status report be filed fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference. (Michel, G)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/28/14 relating this case with member case 2:13-cv-02495. (Kaminski, H)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 1/15/14. Plaintiff is ORDERED to Show Cause ("OSC") in a writing to be filed no later than 1/24/2014, why sanctions sho uld not be imposed against it and/or its counsel for failure to file a timely status report. If a hearing is requested, it will be held just prior to the status conference which is rescheduled for 3/3/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to the status conference. (Kastilahn, A)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/27/13 ORDERING that Mt. Hawley's efforts to serve JDS were reasonably diligent under California Corporations Code section 1720(a) and Mt. Hawley may serve JDS by service on the California Secretary of State as prescribed in California Corporations Code section 1720(a); Mt. Hawley shall serve a proof of service of summons by or before February 21, 2014.(Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. JDS Builders Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDS Builders Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Theresa Mae Rutledge
Represented By: Julia A. Molander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?