Cida v. Lee et al

Plaintiff: Adrian Cida
Defendant: Bonnie Lee, Dorothy Swingle and L. D. Zamora
Case Number: 2:2013cv02289
Filed: November 4, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2018 52 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/1/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
February 21, 2018 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/21/2018 ORDERING plaintiff to file an opposition, if any, to 44 Motion for Summary Judgment within 14 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
January 18, 2018 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/18/18 GRANTING 47 Defendants' motion. The discovery and dispositive motions deadlines set in the 9/08/17 scheduling order 43 are VACATED. (Plummer, M)
January 10, 2018 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/10/2018 GRANTING 45 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff granted up to and including 2/11/2018 to file an opposition to 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Henshaw, R)
July 12, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER and WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/11/2017 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Adrian Cida at 10:00 a.m. on 7/26/2017 in Courtroom #27 before U.S. Magistrate Deborah Barnes. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Henshaw, R)
June 20, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/19/2017 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Adrian Cida via video conferencing at 10:00 a.m. on 7/26/2017 in Courtroom #27 before U.S. Ma gistrate Deborah Barnes. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: U.S. Magistrate Deborah Barnes and IT Dept) (Henshaw, R)
June 9, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/9/2017 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Adrian Cida at 10:00 a.m. on 7/26/2017 in Courtroom #27 before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Custo dian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes) (Henshaw, R)
March 10, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy, Matt Caspar, within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall se rve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/10/17. (Plummer, M) Modified on 3/10/2017 (Plummer, M).
January 5, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/5/17 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
October 13, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/13/16 ORDERING that Service is appropriate for the following defendants: B. Lee, G. Williams. D. Swingle and L.D. Zamora are DISMISSED as defendants in this action. The Clerk of the Court sh all send Plaintiff two USM-285 forms, one summons, an instruction sheet and a copy of the amended complaint filed 7/17/15. Within thirty days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Submission of Documents. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 5, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/05/15 ordering plaintiff's first amended complaint 13 is deemed timely filed. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 15 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's moti on for an extension of time 14 is granted. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached notice of amendment and submit it along with an original and 1 copy of the complaint. Plaintiff is cautioned that not further extensions of time will be granted. (Plummer, M)
September 16, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/15/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs request for an extension of time 11 is partially granted; and Plaintiff is granted 60 days in which to file an amended complaint. No further extensions of time will be granted.(Dillon, M)
May 12, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Adrian Cida signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/12/2014. CDCR is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cida v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Cida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. D. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?