Salazar v. Honest Tea, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sarah A. Salazar
Defendant: Honest Tea, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02318
Filed: November 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/11/2015 ORDERING 86 Honest Tea's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. 67 (Reader, L)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/27/15 ORDERING in sum, defendant has not shown clear error or other meritorious grounds for relief. Honest Tea's Motion for Reconsideration is based on a mere disagreement with the magistrate judges determination that the requested documents and interrogatories are relevant. For the foregoing reasons, Honest Tea's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. 70 ) is DENIED.(Becknal, R)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 57 Motion to Compel the production of documents and further responses to interrogatories signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/13/15. (Kaminski, H)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/18/15. (Manzer, C)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AMENDED STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/17/2015 AMENDING the Jury Trial and Trial Briefs. Trial Briefs Due: 9/5/2016. Jury Trial set for 9/19/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. [All other dates remain pending from 47 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order](Donati, J)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/5/2015 ORDERING that Defendant's 35 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Defendant shall file an answer to the Complaint within twenty-one (21) days. (Zignago, K.)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/9/14 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 12 Motion to Dismiss. The state law claims are dismissed with leave to amend. First Amended Complaint due within 21 days. (Manzer, C)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/20/2014 ORDERING 9 Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar v. Honest Tea, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah A. Salazar
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honest Tea, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?