Advanced Building & Fabrication, Inc., et al. v. California Highway Patrol, et al.
Plaintiff: Advanced Building & Fabrication, Inc., a California corporation and Robert Honan
Defendant: California Highway Patrol, John Wilson and Curtis Ayers
Case Number: 2:2013cv02380
Filed: November 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/26/2020. A Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement due not later than 4/28/2021. The Final Pretrial Conference hearing is reset to 5/27/2021 at 02:00 PM. Counsel to file their exhibit list on or before 4/29/2021. Trial briefs due not later than 4/29/2021. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed in one document by 4/29/2021. Oppositions must be filed in one document by 5/13/2021, and any reply must be filed in one document by 5/20/2021. The motions will be heard at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Becknal, R)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/19/2019 DENYING 165 Motion for an Order to Show Cause and 168 Motion to Amend the Complaint and Reopen Discovery. The Clerk of the Court shall re-terminate counsel associated with the law firm Nossaman, Guthner, Knox & Elliott, LLP. Not later than 30 days following the date this Order is electronically filed, the parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness. (Huang, H)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/13/2019 GRANTING 175 Motion to Dismiss. Curtis Ayers DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs.(Reader, L)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION AGAINST AYERS AND PAYMENT signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/16/19.(Becknal, R)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/21/2017 GRANTING 142 Defendant Curtis Ayers' Motion to Stay; and all proceedings are hereby STAYED pending the outcome of his appeal; the 9/7/2017 hearing is VACATED. (Reader, L)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/26/2017 DENYING 94 , 103 Motions for Summary Judgment; DENYING 113 , 127 Motions to Amend the Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Michel, G.)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SEALING ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/16/2017 ORDERING that the unredacted version of Defendants' Notice of Renewed Motion and Motion to Modify the Amended Pre-Trial Scheduling Order shall be filed under SEAL. (Becknal, R)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/9/2017 GRANTING 105 Request to Seal Document. Document 94-1 and 94-2 are SEALED. Counsel to file Redacted versions. (Donati, J)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/31/2017 DENYING 89 Motion to Modify the Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Michel, G.)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/3/17. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Exhibits H and L to the Declaration of Daniel J. Veroff filed in support of Defendants' Motion to Modify the Amended Pre-Trial Scheduling Order, as well as the unredacted version of Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Modify the Amended Pre-Trial Scheduling Order, shall be filed under seal.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/20/17 ORDERING that the court declines to hold an informal discovery conference at this time. (Becknal, R)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/4/2017. (Michel, G.)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/30/2017 ORDERING the defendants to produce by 4/4/2017, the documents identified by the Bates-stamp numbers 000042-000127, 000131, 000140-000144, 000164-000172, and 000214-000323 contained in the redacted copy of John Wilson's CHP personnel file; ALLOWING the defendants to maintain any proposed redactions to such documents. (Michel, G.)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/23/2017 GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART 71 Motion to Compel. Parties are directed to the order for more details. (Donati, J)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/07/2016 ORDERING that all future dates are hereby VACATED. Not later than 30 days following the date this order is electronically filed, the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report advising the Court with regard to mutually acceptable extended discovery and dispositive motion deadlines. (Jackson, T)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/22/16 ORDERING that Discovery is due 11/14/2016, Designation of Expert Witnesses due 12/14/2016, Supplemental Expert Disclosures due 1/12/2017, and the last day to hear Dispositive motions is 3/9/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/3/16 ORDERING that all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed by 9/12/2016. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/14/2016. The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be 3/9/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER continuing Hearing signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/20/2015. Status Conference is RE-SET for 11/23/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB). Further Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to Status Conference. (Marciel, M)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 6/11/2015 WITHDRAWING defendants' 27 Motion to Dismiss and VACATING hearing set for 6/29/2015. (Marciel, M)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/5/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint 30 is STRIKEN for failure to comply with Rule 15(a).(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/14/15: This Order LIFTS the stay previously entered in this action and CONTINUES the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) conference from 4/20/15 to 6/8/15 at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to the Status Conference, in which the parties shall address all pertinent subjects set forth in Local Rule 240. (Meuleman, A)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/16/2014. This action continues to be STAYED and the Status Conference is RE-SET for 4/20/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB). (Marciel, M) Modified on 10/17/2014 (Marciel, M)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 8/6/14 ORDERING that the stay is CONTINUED; and the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is CONTINUED to 10/27/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to the Status Conference. (Kastilahn, A)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 7/23/2014 ORDERING that each party is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in a writing to be filed no later than 8/4/2014, why sanctions should not be imposed against the party and/or the party's counsel under Rule 16(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to file a timely status report. If a hearing is requested, it will be held on 8/18/2014, at 9:00 a.m., just prior to the status conference, which is rescheduled to that date and time. A joint status report shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference. (Zignago, K.)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/27/14: Each party is Ordered to Show Cause in a writing to be filed no later than July 7, 2014, why sanctions should not be imposed against the party and/or the party's counsel under Rule 16(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to file a timely status report. Status Conference RESET for 8/4/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 2/10/2014 ORDERING that the 8 Motion to Stay is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Further, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference scheduled for hearing on 3/3/2014 is CONTINUED to 7/7/2014, commencing at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the Status Conference. In addition, the pending 6 dismissal motion scheduled for hearing on 2/24/2014 is deemed WITHDRAWN in light of the ruling on the stay motion. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Building & Fabrication, Inc., et al. v. California Highway Patrol, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Building & Fabrication, Inc., a California corporation
Represented By: Brendan F. Macaulay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Honan
Represented By: Brendan F. Macaulay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Represented By: John Michael Feser, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wilson
Represented By: John Michael Feser, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Ayers
Represented By: John Michael Feser, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?