United States of America v. Approximately $9,990.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $9,990.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2013cv02452
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/10/14. (Manzer, C)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/26/2014 ADOPTING 15 Findings and Recommendations; HOLDING IN DEFAULT Theodore Mihos, Truis Bookout; ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT against any right, t itle, or interest of Theodore Mihos, Truis Bookout in the Defendant Currency; FORFEITING all right, title, and interest in the Defendant Currency to the United States to be disposed of according to law; ORDERING all parties to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Theodore Mihos and Truis Bookout be held in default; the United States' 13 Motion for Default Judgment be entered against any right, title, or interest of potential claimants Theodore Mihos and Tr usi Bookout; that Final Judgment be entered; and Default Judgment and Final Judgment of Forfeiture lodged herein be signed by Honorable Morrison C. England, Jr., signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/31/2014. These Findings and Recommendations are SUBMITTED to District Judge England. (Marciel, M)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/24/2014 ORDERING the deadline to file a joint status report is CONTINUED to 5/1/2014. (Donati, J)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION and ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/26/13. (Manzer, C)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/26/2013 ORDERING that the Clerk shall issue a Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem for the defendant currency. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $9,990.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Spivak, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $9,990.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?