Pollard v. Sutter et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth J. Pollard
Defendant: Carl Adams, County of Sutter and Stephanie Cooper
Case Number: 2:2013cv02460
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 4/22/2014 ORDERING 19 Dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 5/12/2014; the pending dismissal motion 16 is deemed WITHDRAWN and the hearing on said motion scheduled for 5/5/2014 is VACATED. (Reader, L)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/26/14 ORDERING that the Pretrial Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 3/3/14 to 3/31/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A further joint status report shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the Status Conference, in which Plaintiff shall adequately address the anticipated timing of the referenced amendments.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 2/25/2014 GRANTING defendant County of Sutter's 13 Request to Vacate 8 Motion to Partially Dismiss Complaint. The 3/10/2014 Hearing date on the Motion is VACATED. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollard v. Sutter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth J. Pollard
Represented By: Elisa W Ungerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?