Wheeler v. Hodges
Plaintiff: Reginald Wheeler
Defendant: M. Hodges, A. Altamirano, R. Cano, G. Nies, J. Languerand, M. Vivero, T. Harper and R. S. den Dulk
Case Number: 2:2013cv02526
Filed: December 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/14/2016 GRANTING plaintiff's 57 motion to voluntarily dismiss this action; and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/06/16 ordering that defendants notify this court within 7 days whether they have any objection to the dismissal of this action. (Plummer, M)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/9/16 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 42 ) be granted. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER adopting in full 32 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/19/15. Plaintiff's 30 Motion for Injunctive Relief is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/6/15 ORDERING that defendants shall file a status report on or before 7/20/15 addressing discovery. Plaintiff shall file his status report 21 days thereafter. RECOMMENDING that the 30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Manzer, C)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/18/15 ordering the 03/11/15 stay is lifted. Within 30 days from the date of this order, defendants shall file a responsive pleading. (Plummer, M)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/10/2015 ORDERING that the 27 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED in full. Defendants' 22 motion for temporary stay is GRANTED. Either party may file a motion to lift the stay once the district court rules on the pending motion to dismiss in Wheeler v. Price, Case No. 2:14-cv-0521 MCE KJN P. CASE STAYED. (Zignago, K.)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/3/2015 RECOMMENDING that defendant's 22 motion for temporary stay be granted. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/07/14 ORDERING the clerk of the court is directed to assign a District Judge to this case. U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. randomly assigned to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/01/14 ordering plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a second amended complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff the form for filing a prisoner civil rights complaint. (Plummer, M)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/24/14 ordering plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Amendment and submit it along with an original and copy of the amended complaint. Plaintiff's 1/21/14 filing 7 is dismissed without prejudice. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff the form for filing a civil rights action pursuant to 42 USC 1983. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hodges
Represented By: Loran M Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Altamirano
Represented By: Loran M Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Cano
Represented By: Loran M Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Nies
Represented By: Loran M Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Languerand
Represented By: Loran M Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Vivero
Represented By: Loran M Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Harper
Represented By: Loran M Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. S. den Dulk
Represented By: Loran M Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?