Khan v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Khalid N Khan
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, T.D. Service Company and S.A. Challenger, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02596
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 41 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/21/16. (Kaminski, H)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/18/15 ORDERING that this action is stayed pending resolution by the District Judge of these findings and recommendations. RECOMMENDING that the third amended complaint be dismissed and this action be closed. F&R referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/17/2015 ADOPTING IN FULL 31 Findings and Recommendations; REFERRING this matter back to Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for further proceedings in light of the plaintiff's 33 Third Amended Complaint. (Michel, G.)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/22/2015 STAYING this action pending the District Court's resolution of the pending 31 Findings and Recommendations. (Michel, G.)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/24/2015 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for plaintiff's lack of standing; Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER not adopting 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; and not adopting 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/23/15. Plaintiff is GRANTED 21 days from the date of this order to file a third amended complaint. This matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Kastilahn, A)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/20/2014 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Donati, J)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/7/2014 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; REFERRING this matter to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING that any objections be filed within fourteen days. (Michel, G)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/17/2014. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Marciel, M)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/11/2014 DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to issue and send to the plaintiff one summons for each defendant named in the 9 First Amended Complaint; ORDERING the plaintiff to complete service of pr ocess on said defendants within 120 days; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that this action may be dismissed pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 4(m) if service of process is not accomplished within 120 days; ORDERING the plaintiff to serve a copy of this order, a co py of the form "Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge" and 17 Order concurrently with service of process and to file with the Clerk a certificate of such service; SETTING a Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference for 11 /19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney; ORDERING the parties to file a status report fourteen (14) days prior to the Status Conference; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to send to the plaintiff copies of the form "Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge. (Michel, G)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/5/2014 GRANTING plaintiff's 16 Request for Reconsideration of Jurisdiction. This action is REINSTATED and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this Order. (Marciel, M)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/19/14 ORDERING that plaintiff's 12 motion for court approval of lis pendens is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/6/14 RECOMMENDING that this Action be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction re 1 Complaint. These Findings and Recommendation are submitted to U.S. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to these F&R due within fourteen days.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/19/13: No later than December 31, 2013, plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalid N Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.D. Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.A. Challenger, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?