Praetorian Insurance Company v. A R Business Group, Inc. et al.,
Plaintiff: Praetorian Insurance Company
Defendant: A R Business Group, Inc Doing business as U.S. Tire & Wheel, Marshaun Tate, S.T., Eliseo Quinterio, Sr., Aida Quintero, Ford Motor Company and Bridgestone Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02639
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 JUDGMENT dated *3/28/2019* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/28/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
March 28, 2019 Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: In accordance with the Ninth Circuit's mandate reversing and remanding this matter, in part, the summary judgment previously granted as to Plaintiff Praetorian's duty to defend Defendant U.S. Tire and Wheel in the underlying matter is vacated, and the Clerk is now directed to enter declaratory judgment in favor of Defendant Tate as to such duty to defend. The remainder of the Court's judgment in Praetorian's favor remains in effect. (Deutsch, S)
August 28, 2018 Filing 73 MANDATE of USCA as to #68 Notice of Appeal, filed by Eliseo Quinterio, Sr., S.T., Marshaun Tate, Aida Quintero. The judgment of this Court, entered 7/10/2018, takes effect this date.This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure.Costs are taxed against the appellee in the amount of $768.40. (Kastilahn, A)
July 10, 2018 Filing 72 USCA ORDER as to #68 Notice of Appeal, ORDERING that The decision of the District Court is REVERSED and REMANDED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 5, 2017 Filing 71 USCA CASE NUMBER 17-15303 for #68 Notice of Appeal, filed by Eliseo Quinterio, Sr., S.T., Marshaun Tate, Aida Quintero. (Zignago, K.)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/21/2017 ACCORDINGLY it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall PERMANENTLY REMOVE and DELETE the unredacted version of Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal. ECF No. #66 . (Reader, L)
February 17, 2017 Filing 69 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #68 Notice of Appeal filed by Eliseo Quinterio, Sr., S.T., Marshaun Tate, Aida Quintero. Notice of Appeal filed *2/16/2017*, Complaint filed *12/20/2013* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *1/17/2017*. ** *Fee Status: Paid on 2/16/2017 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 16, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE of APPEAL by Eliseo Quinterio, Sr, Aida Quintero, S.T., Marshaun Tate. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0972-6918155) (Barr, John). Receipt 0972-6918155 refunded; Already paid the appeal fee on 2/13/17. Modified on 2/27/2017 (Woodson, A)
February 16, 2017 Filing 67 PROPOSED ORDER re Seal Document by Marshaun Tate. (Barr, John)
February 13, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE of APPEAL by Marshaun Tate. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0972-6910756) (Barr, John) (Main Document #66 replaced on 2/22/2017, pursuant to Order [70[) (Reader, L).
February 7, 2017 Filing 65 TAXATION of COSTS in amount of $5032.58 against A R Business Group, Inc. (Washington, S)
January 27, 2017 Filing 64 BILL of COSTS SUBMITTED by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Selvin, Gary) Modified on 1/30/2017 (Becknal, R).
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 JUDGMENT dated *1/17/17* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/13/17. (Becknal, R)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/13/17 ORDERING Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. #46 is GRANTED, and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. #48 is DENIED. The matter having now been concluded in its entirety, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the file. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
October 31, 2016 Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Plaintiff's and Defendant's Motions for Summary for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 46 and 48), both scheduled for hearing on November 3, 2016, are submitted without oral argument and the hearing is vacated. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/19/16 ORDERING that, pursuant to #59 Stipulation, the hearing on the #46 #48 Motions for Summary Judgment are CONTINUED to 11/3/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.(Benson, A)
August 18, 2016 Filing 59 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment re 58 Minute Order by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order)(Selvin, Gary) Modified on 8/19/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 12, 2016 Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The parties' Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 46 and 48), presently set for hearing on August 25, 2016, are continued on the Court's own motion to October 20, 2016, at 2:00 p.m., in courtroom 7. Given that continuance, the dates set forth in the Fourth Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No. 43), including the November 17, 2016, Final Pretrial Conference and the January 9, 2017, bench trial are hereby VACATED. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after receiving this Court's ruling(s) on the last filed dispositive motion(s). If the parties do not intend to file dispositive motions, the parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after the close of discovery and the notice must include statements of intent to forgo the filing of dispositive motions. The parties are to set forth in their Notice of Trial Readiness, the appropriateness of special procedures, whether this case is related to any other case(s) on file in the Eastern District of California, the prospect for settlement, their estimated trial length, any request for a jury, and their availability for trial. After review of the parties' Joint Notice of Trial Readiness, the Court will issue an order that sets forth new dates for a final pretrial conference and trial. (Deutsch, S)
August 4, 2016 Filing 57 REPLY to #54 Opposition to #46 Motion for Summary Judgment by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Response to Additional Material Facts, #2 Objections to Response to Separate Statement, #3 Response to Objections to Evidence) (Selvin, Gary) Modified on 8/5/2016 (Michel, G.).
August 4, 2016 Filing 56 REPLY to #55 Opposition to #48 Motion for Summary Judgment by Marshaun Tate. (Attachments: #1 Response to Objections to Declaration of Dugan Barr, #2 Declaration of Estee Lewis) (Barr, John) Modified on 8/5/2016 (Michel, G.).
July 21, 2016 Filing 55 OPPOSITION by Praetorian Insurance Company to #48 Motions for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Response to Separate Statement AND Additional Undisputed Facts, #2 Selvin Declaration & Exhibits #3 Objections to Declaration of Dugan Barr, #4 Request for Judicial, #5 Joint Stipulation to Use Declarations Filed with Motions as Supporting Evidence)(Selvin, Gary) Modified on 7/22/2016 (Kaminski, H).
July 21, 2016 Filing 54 OPPOSITION by Marshaun Tate to #46 Motions for Summary Judgment, #48 Motions for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Response to Praetorian Seperate Statement, #2 Declaration of Lewis, #3 Exhibits 1-3 to Declaration of Lewis, #4 Exhibits 4-5 to Declaration of Lewis, #5 Exhibits 6-7 to Declaration of Lewis, #6Exhibits 8-9 to Declaration of Lewis, #7 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Lewis, #8 Exhibits 11-12 to Declaration of Lewis, #9 Objection to Evidence, #10 Notice of Lodging)(Barr, John) Modified on 7/22/2016 (Kaminski, H).
July 1, 2016 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM by Praetorian Insurance Company in SUPPORT of #46 Motions for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Selvin, Gary)
June 30, 2016 Filing 52 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Praetorian Insurance Company in re #46 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Selvin, Gary)
June 30, 2016 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Susan Matlock in SUPPORT OF #46 Motions for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(Selvin, Gary)
June 30, 2016 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Gary Selvin in SUPPORT OF #46 Motions for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F)(Selvin, Gary)
June 30, 2016 Filing 49 SEPARATE STATEMENT of Undisputed Material Facts by Plaintiff in SUPPORT of #46 Motions for Summary Judgment. (Selvin, Gary) Modified on 7/5/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 30, 2016 Filing 48 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Marshaun Tate. Motion Hearing SET for 8/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Declaration of Barr, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Barr, #5 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Declaration of Dennis Carlson, #12 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Carlson, #13 Exhibit 2, #14 Declaration of S. David Rosental , #15 Request for Judicial, #16 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #17 Exhibit B, #18 Exhibit C, #19 Exhibit D, #20 Exhibit E, #21 Notice of Lodging Deposition Transcripts)(Barr, John) Modified on 7/1/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 30, 2016 Filing 47 STATEMENT of MATERIAL FACTS in Support of #46 #48 Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgement by Plaintiff Praetorian Insurance Company. (Selvin, Gary)
June 30, 2016 Filing 46 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Praetorian Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Selvin, Gary)
May 24, 2016 Filing 45 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Daniel S. Rodman,Alina Mooradian for Ford Motor Company, attorney Jonathan Raymond Murphy terminated (Rodman, Daniel)
May 20, 2016 Filing 44 JOINT DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Eliseo Quinterio, Sr, Aida Quintero, S.T., Marshaun Tate. Attorney Barr, John Dugan Douglas added. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A to Exhibit 1, #2 Appendix B (Part 1) to Exhibit 1, #3 Appendix B (Part 2) to Exhibit 1, #4 Appendix B (Part 3) to Exhibit 1, #5 Appendix B (Part 4) to Exhibit 1, #6 Appendix B (Part 5) to Exhibit 1, #7 Appendix C (Part 1) to Exhibit 1, #8 Appendix C (Part 2) to Exhibit 1, #9 Appendix C (Part 3) to Exhibit 1, #10 Appendix C (Part 4) to Exhibit 1, #11 Appendix C (Part 5) to Exhibit 1, #12 Appendix C (Part 6) to Exhibit 1, #13 Appendix D to Exhibit 1, #14 Appendix E to Exhibit 1)(Barr, John) Modified on 5/25/2016 (Zignago, K.).(DVD submitted as attachment) Modified on 5/26/2016 (Becknal, R).
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FOURTH AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on May 4, 2016. All discovery shall be completed by May 16, 2016. The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be August 25, 2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is set on November 17, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. A bench trial is set on January 9, 2017, at 9:00 a.m., in courtroom 7. (Deutsch, S)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 THIRD AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 4/27/16, ORDERING that all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed by 5/16/2016. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/20/2016. The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be 7/1/2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 11/17/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. The parties shall file, not later than 10/27/2016, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement. The parties shall file trial briefs not later than 10/27/2016. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 10/27/2016. Oppositions must be filed by 11/3/2016, and any reply must be filed by 11/10/2016. Bench Trial is SET for 1/9/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 5/4/2016 (Deutsch, S).
April 14, 2016 Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court, having received the parties' Stipulation to Continue the Trial and other dates (ECF No. 40), hereby approves said extension request, except that the Final Pretrial Conference will be held on November 17, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7. The bench trial is now set for January 9, 2017 at 9:00 a.m., in courtroom 7. A Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order setting forth all new dates and deadlines will be issued shortly.(Deutsch, S)
April 5, 2016 Filing 40 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue the Trial and Extend the Discovery, Expert Disclosure and Motion Dates by Marshaun Tate. (Barr, John) Modified on 4/6/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 15, 2016 Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion the October 28, 2016, bench trial is vacated and continued to October 31, 2016, at 9:00 a.m., in courtroom 7. The September 22, 2016, final pretrial conference is confirmed for hearing at 2:00 p.m., in courtroom 7. The parties must file their Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement by September 1, 2016. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by August 25, 2016, oppositions by September 1, 2016, and replies if any by September 8, 2016. Trial briefs must be filed by October 17, 2016.(Deutsch, S).
February 3, 2016 Filing 38 AMENDED NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by Eliseo Quinterio, Sr., Aida Quintero. (Rosenthal, Soren) Modified on 2/4/2016 (Michel, G.).
February 3, 2016 Filing 37 AMENDED NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by Marshaun Tate, S. T. Attorney Paul J. O'Rourke, Jr. ADDED. (Barr, John) Modified on 2/4/2016 (Michel, G.).
February 3, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by Eliseo Quinterio, Sr., Aida Quintero. Attorney Paul J. O'Rourke, Jr. ADDED. (Rosenthal, Soren) Modified on 2/4/2016 (Michel, G.).
January 26, 2016 Filing 35 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Marshaun Tate: Amended #34 Association of Counsel. (Barr, John)
January 26, 2016 Filing 34 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Paul J. O'Rourke, Jr for Marshaun Tate. (Barr, John)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/22/15: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/20/2016. Discovery due by 4/15/2016.The last day to hear dispositive motions is 7/29/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. Bench Trial set for 10/28/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
December 10, 2015 Filing 32 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER continuing Trial to 7/22/2016 and extending Discovery, and Expert Disclosure dates by Marshaun Tate. (Barr, John) Modified on 12/18/2015 (Marciel, M)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/28/2015 ORDERING that all Discovery shall be completed by 12/18/2015. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/22/2016. The last day to hear Dispositive Motions shall be 3/24/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. The parties shall file trial briefs not later than 6/2/2016. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 5/26/2016. Bench Trial set for 7/22/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Zignago, K.)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING DATES signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 06/30/15 ORDERING that the following dates are EXTENDED as follows: Discovery due by 12/18/2015; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/22/2016; last day to hear Dispositive Motions is 3/24/2016; Final Pretrial Conference reset for 6/9/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Trial reset for 7/22/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.(Benson, A)
June 24, 2015 Filing 29 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Continue Trial and Extend the Discovery Cut Off and Expert Disclosure Dates by Marshaun Tate. (Barr, John) Modified on 6/24/2015 (Kastilahn, A).
April 2, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE of FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to AR Business Group, Inc. dba U.S. Tire & Wheel by Praetorian Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AR Business Group's Bankruptcy Petition, #2 Proof of Service)(Selvin, Gary)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/27/15 ORDERING that the Discovery cut off is EXTENDED from 4/24/15 to 7/20/2015, and the expert witness disclosure is EXTENDED from 6/26/15 to 8/14/2015. All other dates set forth in the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order filed 9/11/14 remain unchanged.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 19, 2015 Filing 26 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extend the Discovery Cut Off Date and Expert Disclosure Date by Marshaun Tate. (Barr, John)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/16/15. (Kaminski, H)
March 10, 2015 Filing 24 STIPULATION and PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Signature Pages) (Korte, Robin) Modified on 3/13/2015 (Michel, G.).
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/9/14: Discovery due by 4/24/2015. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 6/26/2015. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/29/2015. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 12/16/15. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Trial Briefs due by 12/23/15. Bench Trial set for 2/26/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 7 days. (Manzer, C)
July 16, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Mary Patricia Lightfoot on behalf of Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Mary P. Lightfoot. Attorney Lightfoot, Mary Patricia added. (Lightfoot, Mary)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/24/14. Added attorney Gary Robert Selvin for Praetorian Insurance Company, attorney Gregory R. De La Pena TERMINATED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 12, 2014 Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Praetorian Insurance Company. Attorney Korte, Robin D. added. (Korte, Robin)
June 10, 2014 Filing 19 ANSWER by A R Business Group, Inc. Attorney Kaufman, James J added.(Kaufman, James)
June 10, 2014 Filing 18 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent signatures page, #2 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Selvin, Gary)
March 10, 2014 Filing 17 FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 13-JCCP 4160, 13-JCCP 4160 by Ford Motor Company. (Murphy, Jonathan) Modified on 3/13/2014 (Becknal, R).
March 10, 2014 Filing 16 ANSWER by Ford Motor Company. Attorney Murphy, Jonathan Raymond added.(Murphy, Jonathan)
March 5, 2014 Filing 15 [DISREGARD - DUPLICATE OF #11 Summons Returned Executed] SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ford Motor Company served on 2/18/2014, answer due 3/11/2014. (De La Pena, Gregory) Modified on 3/6/2014 (Zignago, K.).
March 5, 2014 Filing 14 [DISREGARD - DUPLICATE OF #12 Summons Returned Executed] SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Bridgestone Americas, Inc. served on 2/18/2014, answer due 3/11/2014. (De La Pena, Gregory) Modified on 3/6/2014 (Zignago, K.).
March 5, 2014 Filing 13 [DISREGARD - DUPLICATE OF #12 Summons Returned Executed] SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: A R Business Group, Inc served on 2/12/2014, answer due 3/5/2014. (De La Pena, Gregory) Modified on 3/6/2014 (Zignago, K.).
March 5, 2014 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: A.R. Business Group Inc. served on 2/12/2014, answer due 3/11/2014. (De La Pena, Gregory) Modified on 3/6/2014 (Zignago, K.).
March 5, 2014 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ford Motor Company served on 2/18/2014, answer due 3/11/2014. (De La Pena, Gregory) Modified on 3/6/2014 (Zignago, K.).
March 5, 2014 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Bridgestone Americas, Inc. served on 2/18/2014, answer due 3/11/2014. (De La Pena, Gregory) Modified on 3/6/2014 (Zignago, K.).
March 3, 2014 Filing 9 ANSWER by Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. Attorney Larson, Arnold D. added.(Larson, Arnold)
February 23, 2014 Filing 8 ANSWER by Eliseo Quinterio, Sr, Aida Quintero. Attorney Rosenthal, Soren David added.(Rosenthal, Soren)
February 19, 2014 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by S.T., Marshaun Tate. Attorney Barr, John Dugan Douglas added.(Barr, John)
December 24, 2013 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L) Modified on 1/31/2014 (Reader, L).
December 24, 2013 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *A R Business Group, Inc, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Eliseo Quinterio, Sr, Aida Quintero, S.T., Marshaun Tate* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory R. De La Pena* *De La Pena & Holiday, LLP* *One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2860* *San Francisco, CA 94111*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 20, 2013 Filing 4 STATEMENT of FRCP 7.1 Disclosure by Plaintiff Praetorian Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,. (De La Pena, Gregory)
December 20, 2013 Filing 3 EXHIBITS by Praetorian Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(De La Pena, Gregory) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/24/2013) (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 20, 2013 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Praetorian Insurance Company (De La Pena, Gregory)
December 20, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Recovery of Defense Fees and Costs and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants by Praetorian Insurance Company. Attorney De La Pena, Gregory R. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-5102128) (De La Pena, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Praetorian Insurance Company v. A R Business Group, Inc. et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Praetorian Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary Robert Selvin
Represented By: Gregory R. De La Pena
Represented By: Robin D. Korte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A R Business Group, Inc Doing business as U.S. Tire & Wheel
Represented By: James J. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshaun Tate
Represented By: John Dugan Douglas Barr
Represented By: Paul J. O'Rourke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.T.
Represented By: John Dugan Douglas Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliseo Quinterio, Sr.
Represented By: John Dugan Douglas Barr
Represented By: S. David Rosenthal
Represented By: Paul J. O'Rourke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aida Quintero
Represented By: John Dugan Douglas Barr
Represented By: S. David Rosenthal
Represented By: Paul J. O'Rourke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Alina Mooradian
Represented By: Daniel S. Rodman
Represented By: Jonathan Raymond Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Arnold D. Larson
Represented By: Mary Patricia Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?