Thomas et al v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jesse James Thomas, III and Tiffany F Thomas
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Trans Union LLC and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv02674
Filed: December 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 03/29/16 ORDERING that, pursuant to 58 Stipulation, all claims of Plaintiffs Jesse James Thomas III and Tiffany F. Thomas against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Plaintiffs Jesse James Thomas III and Tiffany F. Thomas and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. shall each bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/02/16 ORDERING that defendant's 53 Request to Extend Discovery Deadline is DENIED. (Benson, A)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/29/15 ORDERING that the Discovery cutoff date is CONTINUED from 5/29/15 to 10/29/2015, and the Expert Discovery cut-off deadline is CONTINUED from 6/16/15 to 11/16/2015. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/20/2015 CONTINUING the Settlement Conference to 3/17/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (cc: Magistrate Judge Allison Claire) (Michel, G.)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/27/2015 ORDERING that the discovery cut-off deadline for non-expert discovery is EXTENDED from 2/16/2015, to 5/29/2015, and the expert discovery cut-off deadline is EXTENDED from 3/2/2015, to 6/16/2015. An Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order will issue. (Zignago, K.)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/22/2015 CONTINUING the Settlement Conference to 7/30/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Michel, G.)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/22/14 ORDERING that 28 the Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. Mark F. Anderson of Anderson, Ogilvie & Brewer LLP, is RELIEVED as counsel for Plaintiffs. The Clerk shall SERVE a copy of this Memorandum and Order on Plaintiffs at P.O. Box 4392, Citrus Heights, California 95611-4392. (Kastilahn, A)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/29/2014 MODIFYING the 19 Pretrial Scheduling Order; ORDERING that discovery be completed by 2/16/2015; ORDERING that experts be disclosed by 3/2/2015. (Michel, G)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/20/14: Settlement Conference RESET for 2/19/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Kaminski, H)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER 25 for continuance signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/2/2014. Settlement Conference is RE-SCHEDULED for 10/16/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC). The date for submission of Settlement Statements is 10/9/2014. (Marciel, M)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/24/14. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/13/2014 DISMISSING Equifax Information Services LLC and Trans Union LLC with prejudice. Each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Nandini Iyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Monica K. Katz-Lapides
Represented By: Debra A. Miller, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse James Thomas, III
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany F Thomas
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?