Proeung v. Maximus, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sambath Proeung
Defendant: Maximus, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00063
Filed: January 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/16/15 re: 22 DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, in its entirety. Each party to this action shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs of suit. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER 19 for extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/15/2014. Parties agree to extend the time for hearing on any Motion for Summary Judgment to 56 days from filing and service of Motion. In addition, parties agree that time to file and serve any opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment shall be not less than 14 days preceding hearing on Motion. (Marciel, M)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/20/14. (Kaminski, H)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/14/14: Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proeung v. Maximus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sambath Proeung
Represented By: Kara Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximus, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Holly
Represented By: Jeremy A. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?