Milton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ramona Milton
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2014cv00074
Filed: January 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/21/2015 RECOMMENDING that the 14 Motion for Summary Judgment be denied; RECOMMENDING that the 19 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment be granted; RECOMMENDING t hat judgment be entered for the Commissioner of Social Security; RECOMMENDING that the Clerk of Court be directed to close this case; DISCHARGING 13 Order to Show Cause; REFERRING this matter to Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that any objections be filed within fourteen (14) days. (Michel, G)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/6/2014 ORDERING the plaintiff to show cause in writing, within 28 days, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with court orders; ORDERING the plaintiff to file a written statement within 28 days, indicating the consent to or decline of the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings; ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Summary and/or Motion to Remand within 28 days; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that a failure to timely file any of the required writings will result in the dismissal of the action without prejudice. (Michel, G) Modified on 8/6/2014 (Michel, G).
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/15/14. The Clerk is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk is further directed t o serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal (USM). Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM an original and five copies of the completed summons, five copies of the complaint, five copies of the sc heduling order, and a completed USM-285 form, and shall file a statement with the court that such documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (cc: USM) (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jacob Mikow, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Milton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?