Anselmo et al v. Maryland Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Eleanor J. Anselmo, Rosalie A. Anselmo, Karen L. Lilienthal, Dave Davelaar and Linda Davelaar
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company and Century Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv00162
Filed: January 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER 27 for Dismissal signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/26/2015. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice and in its entirety. Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees and costs incurred. (Marciel, M)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/5/15: Rosalie A. Anselmo terminated. KAREN L. LILIENTHAL, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF ROSALIE A. ANSELMO TRUST A under the Trust Agreement dated December 21, 1992, and KAREN L. LILIENTHAL, TRUSTEE of EDWARD A. ANSELMO EXEMPT TRUST B under the Trust Agreement dated December 21, 1992 added. (Kaminski, H)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER 22 for extension of time signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/2/2015. Parties have to and including 3/16/2015 to file a Stipulation of Dismissal. (Marciel, M)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/25/2014 ORDERING 19 Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 5/1/2015; Disclosure of rebuttal experts by 6/1/2015; Discovery due by 7/1/2015; Dispositive Motions filed by 8/3/2015; Final Pretrial Conference Reset for 10/26/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Reader, L)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/12/14. (Manzer, C)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/24/14: The time within which Maryland Casualty Company may respond to the Complaint is extended to March 11, 2014. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anselmo et al v. Maryland Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor J. Anselmo
Represented By: Kenneth Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie A. Anselmo
Represented By: Kenneth Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen L. Lilienthal
Represented By: Kenneth Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Davelaar
Represented By: Kenneth Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Davelaar
Represented By: Kenneth Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?