Shamberger et al v. Tello et al
Plaintiff: Lindsey Shamberger and E. C.
Defendant: Dana Tello and County of Yolo
Case Number: 2:2014cv00243
Filed: January 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/23/16 ORDERING that this action be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED without prejudice; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Motion for summary judgment or, alternatively, summary adjudication (Docket No. 23 ) be, and the same hereby is, DENIED AS MOOT. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/28/2016 resetting the hearing on 23 Defendant Tello's Motion for Summary Judgment for 11/28/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/26/2016 ORDERING that the complaint and claims of Plaintiff Lindsey Shamberger against Defendants, Dana Tell and County of Yolo, are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each side to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. (Zignago, K.)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/28/2015 GRANTING 16 Defendant Yolo County's Motion to Dismiss. The 5/4/2015 hearing date is vacated. Plaintiffs shall have twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file an amended complaint if they can do so in a manner consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shamberger et al v. Tello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Shamberger
Represented By: Harry David Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. C.
Represented By: Harry David Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Tello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Yolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?