Kemper v. Pie, et al.

Plaintiff: Winston Kemper
Defendant: Crosson and Pie
Case Number: 2:2014cv00305
Filed: January 30, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/10/2016 RECOMMENDING defendants' 40 , 49 motions to dismiss be granted, and this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
June 10, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/10/16 ordering that, within fourteen days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss. (Plummer, M)
February 26, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/26/2016 ORDERING, within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the 40 motion to dismiss. (Yin, K)
December 18, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/18/15 denying 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
August 21, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/20/15 ordering that plaintiff show cause within 14 days why defendant Dr. Pie should not be dismissed from this action without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
June 30, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/29/15 DENYING 32 Motion for Sanctions. (Dillon, M)
October 28, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/28/14 ordering that within 30 days, plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice based on plaintiff's admitted failure to exhaust administrative remedies prior to filing suit in federal court. (Plummer, M)
September 10, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/10/2014 DISMISSING 22 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Amendment and submit it to the court along with the Second Amended Complaint. (Donati, J)
August 15, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/15/14 ORDERING that 19 Motion to appoint counsel is DENIED without prejudice.(Dillon, M)
July 24, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/23/14 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
June 17, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/17/14 ORDERING that plaintiff show cause, within 21 days, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice.(Dillon, M)
May 5, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/5/2014 GRANTING plaintiff 30 days to pay the $400.00 filing fee; plaintiff's failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this action.(Yin, K)
February 7, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/7/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Cle rk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; plaintiffs failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemper v. Pie, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?