Joseph v. Parciasepe, et al.
Plaintiff: Alonzo Joseph
Defendant: T. Parciasepe and William Knipp
Case Number: 2:2014cv00414
Filed: February 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER adopting in full 76 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 11/15/17. Plaintiff's 74 motion to rescind the settlement is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/27/17 recommending that plaintiff's motion to rescind the settlement 74 be denied. MOTION 74 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/18/17 granting 61 Motion for a copy of the transcript. The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff a copy of the transcript from the January 18, 2017 settlement hearing. (cc: ECRO) (Plummer, M)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/6/2017 DENYING 59 Request for court intervention with respect to payment pursuant to the settlement agreement WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature. (Washington, S)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/13/16 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Alonzo James Joseph at 9:30 am on 1/4/17 in Courtroom 25 before Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Dillon, M)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/2/2016 DENYING plaintiff's 44 motion for appointment of counsel.(Yin, K)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/24/2016 DENYING plaintiff's 41 request for the court to issue an offer of judgment and require mandatory settlement negotiations. Defendant shall notify the court within 14 days whether he believes a settlement conference would be beneficial at this time. (Yin, K)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/11/16 granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Compel. The motion is granted to the extent that defendant must respond to requests for production one, two, three, four and six from t he second set of production requests as narrowed by the court above. The motion is denied in all other respects. Discovery is re-opened for the limited purpose of having defendant respond to Requests for Production One, Two, Three, Four and Six fro m the second set of production requests and for plaintiff to compel further responses if necessary. Defendant shall have until 6/13/16 to serve his responses to plaintiff's requests for production as set forth in this order. Plaintiff shall have until 7/18/16 to file any motion to compel related to the responses to requests for production one, two, three, four and six from the second set of production requests. (Plummer, M)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/08/16 ordering within 7 days of the filing of this order, defendant shall file with the court his responses to plaintiff's 10/10/15 requests for admissions, interrogatories, and production. Defendant should include his certificates of service and any supplemental responses. Defendant's motion to modify the dispositive motion deadline 35 is granted and the 4/08/16 dispositive motion deadline is vacated. The deadline for the parties to file motions for summary judgment will be re-set upon disposition of plaintiff's motion to compel. (Plummer, M)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/29/16 granting 28 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is construed as a renewed motion for counsel 29 and is denied without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/4/2015 DENYING plaintiff's 23 motion for a court-appointed investigator, and plaintiff's 26 motion for counsel. Within 30 days, the Attorney General's Office and Deputy AG Michelle M. Mayer shall ensure that plaintiff is provided an opportunity to review the non-confidential portions of his central file and make copies of any documents therein that he believes are necessary to respond to the discovery requests or t o support his case. Alternatively, counsel for defendant may choose to produce to plaintiff the relevant, non-confidential portions of his central file. A notice of compliance shall be filed with the court within seven days of plaintiff reviewing and copying his central file or receiving a copy of the relevant, nonconfidential portions of his central file. Plaintiff's responses to defendant's requests for production and interrogatories will be due 21 days after plaintiff either (1) has an opportunity to review his central file and obtain the necessary copies or (2) receives a copy of the relevant, non-confidential portions of his central file. (Yin, K)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/23/15 denying 20 Motion for entry of default. (Plummer, M)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER adopting in full, 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 8/13/15. Counts I and II are dismissed in part without leave to amend. Count III and defendant Knipp are dismissed in their entirety without leave to amend. Defendant Parciasepe is ORDERED to respond to Counts I and II of the second amended complaint within 30 days from the filing of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/5/15 DENYING as premature 16 Motion for default judgment.(Dillon, M)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/23/15 ORDERING plaintiff's motion for leave to amend 13 is denied as moot. The clerk of the court shall randomly assign a district judge to this action. U .S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that Counts 1 and 2 be dismissed in part as set forth in Section 3 above, without leave to amend. Count 3 and defendant Knipp be dismissed in their entirety without leave to amend. Defendant Parciasepe be ordered to respond to Counts 1 and 2 of the second amended complaint, as set forth above in section 4, within 30 days from the date of the district judge's review and adoption of the instant findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/3/2014 DISMISSING the amended complaint with leave to file a second amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/20/14 ordering the complaint is dismissed for the reasons discussed above, with leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of service of this order. Plaintiff's motions to amend the exhibits attached to his complaint 5 , 8 are denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion to join Marcelino Clemente as an additional plaintiff 6 is denied. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Parciasepe, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Parciasepe
Represented By: Michelle Domingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Knipp
Represented By: Michelle Domingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?