Phan v. Medtronic Inc
Plaintiff: Irving Phan
Defendant: Medtronic Inc
Intervenor_plaintiff: State of California
Case Number: 2:2014cv00419
Filed: February 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 06/06/16. District Judge John A. Mendez RECUSED. Case REASSIGNED to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller for all further proceedings; Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newmann remains the Magistrate Judge assigned. The new case number is 2:14-cv-0419 KJM KJN. (Benson, A)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/12/16 ORDERING that Relator Irving Phan shall serve all pleadings and motions filed in this action, including supporting memoranda and related papers and orders, upon each of the Plaintiff States individually. All claims asserted on behalf of Maryland are hereby dismissed without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/4/2016 UNSEALING the 16 First Amended Complaint; ORDERING that said complaint be served upon the defendant by the relators; ORDERING that all other contents of the Court's file in this action remain un der seal, except for this Order and the United States' 32 Notice of Election to Decline Intervention, which is to be served upon the defendant by the relators only after service of the 16 First Amended Complaint; LIFTING the seal as to all o ther matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order; ORDERING the parties to serve all pleadings and motions filed in this action upon the United States; PERMITTING the United States to order any deposition transcripts; FINDING that th e United States is entitled to intervene in this action, for good cause, at any time; ORDERING the parties to serve all notices of appeal upon the United States; INFORMING all parties that the Court will provide the United States with notice and an opportunity to be heard before ruling or granting any proposition that this action be dismissed. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phan v. Medtronic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Phan
Represented By: Robert J. Nelson
Represented By: Fabrice Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?