Cooper Belanger v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Karen Agatha Cooper Belanger
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2014cv00533
Filed: February 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER 22 for award of fees and expenses signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/11/2016. Plaintiff shall be awarded attorney fees and expenses in amount of $3700.00 under Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), and costs in amount of $400.00 under 28 U.S.C. § 1920. (Marciel, M)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/4/2015 ORDERING Plaintiff's 15 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; Defendant's 19 cross motion for summary judgment is DENIED; the Commissioner's decision is REVERSED; and this matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/9/15. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due on or before 3/23/15. (Manzer, C)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/5/15 ORDERING that the time for Plaintiff to file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand is EXTENDED to 12/30/14; and that Defendant shall continue to have until 2/6/2015, to file his opposition. Any reply by Plaintiff will continue to be due 2/16/15. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER 12 extending Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/6/2014. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand now due 12/9/2014. Defendant shall file Opposition by 2/6/2015 and any Reply by plaintiff shall be filed by 2/16/2015. (Marciel, M)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/29/14 ORDERING that plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including 9/30/14, in which to file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand; Defendant may have an extension of time to 10/30/14 to file his opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by plaintiff will be due 11/6/14. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper Belanger v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Agatha Cooper Belanger
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T Chen
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?