Tenerelli v. Shasta County Jail et al
Plaintiff: |
Patrick Tenerelli |
Defendant: |
Shasta County Jail, Dave Kent and Shasta County |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv00553 |
Filed: |
February 26, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Shasta |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Presiding Judge: |
William B. Shubb |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 16, 2015 |
Filing
19
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/16/2015 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to state a claim. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
May 7, 2015 |
Filing
17
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from prison account of plaintiff Patrick Tenerelli signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/6/2015. Clerk shall serve a copy of Order on both Financial Department and Director of CA Dept. of Correction & Rehabilitation together with copy of In Forma Pauperis Application. [cc: Director of CDCR] (Marciel, M)
|
April 8, 2014 |
Filing
10
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/8/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to submit the required affidavit and trust account statement. Failure to comply with this order may result dismiss al of this case. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner. The Clerk of the Court shall amend the title to docket entry number 9 , as it is not a first amended comp laint. Rather, it is a collection of exhibits, including an affidavit for a waiver of fees. The Clerk of the Court shall amend the title to docket entry number 8 (or otherwise disregard the filing), as it is not a clear indication of plaintiffs consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge, and plaintiff previously declined to consent to such jurisdiction. (Dillon, M)
|
March 4, 2014 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/04/14 ordering plaintiff has 30 days from the date of service of this order to submit either the filing fee or the application required by section 1915(a). The clerk of the court is directed to mail to plaintiff a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Plummer, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?