Trujillo v. Hithe
Plaintiff: Guillermo Cruz Trujillo
Defendant: Hithe and Zanini
Case Number: 2:2014cv00584
Filed: March 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/23/2018 GRANTING 108 Motion for Extension of Time and DENYING as moot 109 Motion to Compel Discovery. Plaintiff's objections to 107 Findings and Recommendations to be filed within 60 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/9/2018 RECOMMENDIING 105 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted on the grounds that plaintiff has failed to exhaust his administrative remedies and this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/14/18 GRANTING 83 Motion to file an amended answer. The Clerk of Court is directed to separately file the Proposed Amended Answer, 83 -11, as the Amended Answer. Defendants motion for security 85 is DENIED. (Plummer, M)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/13/17 DENYING 98 Motion to dismiss post security order. (Plummer, M)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/12/2017 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 95 motion to appoint counsel. (Yin, K)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/15/2017 ORDERING the Clerk to alter the docket to reflect that plaintiff's 90 "Third Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint" is more appropriately a "Motion to Amend the Complaint". Plaintiff's 90 motion to amend the complaint is DENIED. Plaintiff shall file his responses to defendant's 83 motion for leave to file an amended answer and 85 motion for security on or before 9/4/2017.(Yin, K)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/30/17 ordering that the order filed 03/28/17 80 is vacated. (Plummer, M)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/27/17 ordering that, within thirty days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to defendant Hithes motion to compel plaintiffs responses to defendants first set of interrogatories 79 . (Plummer, M) Modified on 3/28/2017 (Plummer, M).
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 77 Motion for permission to produce exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/27/17. (Plummer, M)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER adopting 73 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/27/16: Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 53) is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion for summary judgment on the same matter. (Kaminski, H)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/6/16 ORDERING that plaintiff motion for extension of time (ECF No. 56 ) is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss sh all be deemed timely filed. Plaintiff's requests for appointment of counsel (ECF Nos. 57 & 60 ) are DENIED without prejudice. It is RECOMMENDED that defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 53 ) be denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion for summary judgment on the same matter. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/26/2015 DENINIG as unnecessary plaintiff's 35 motion to amend the complaint, plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint will be screened in due course; and plaintiff's 39 motion for default is DENIED as premature. (Yin, K)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/04/14. (Plummer, M)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/9/2014 GRANTING plaintiff's 31 motion for an extension of time; plaintiff has 30 days to file an amended complaint ; and plaintiff's 32 "amended motion", construed to be a motion for leave to amend the complaint, is DENIED as unnecessary. (Yin, K)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/4/14 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Guillermo Cuz Trujillo and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial) (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Hithe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Cruz Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hithe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?