Italian Colors Restaurant, et al. v. Harris
Plaintiff: Italian Colors Restaurant, Alan Carlson, Laurelwood Cleaners, LLC, Jonathan Ebrahimian, Family Life Corporation, Toshio Chino, Stonecrest Gas & Wash, Salam Razuki, Leon's Transmission Service, Inc. and Vincent Archer
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Case Number: 2:2014cv00604
Filed: March 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/28/2019 EXTENDING the deadline for filing a joint status report to 6/14/2019. (Zignago, K.)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION and ORDER re payment of Attorney's Fees, Expenses and costs signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/4/19. Defendant will pay Plaintiffs the total settlement amount of $293,000 (the "Payment") In the event that Defendant has not made the Payment by 10/1/19, Plaintiffs may seek costs, fees, and interest by noticed Motion. The time for Plaintiffs to file such a Motion for costs and fees is extended until 11/1/19.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on January 9, 2019 ORDERING that the deadline for the plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees, related nontaxable expenses, or costs in this action is hereby extended to February 4, 2019. (Kaminski, H)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/19/18 EXTENDING the deadline for the Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys fees, related nontaxable expenses, or costs in this action to January 4, 2019. (Becknal, R)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/10/18 EXTENDING the deadline for the plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees, related nontaxable expenses, or costs to 11/15/18. (Becknal, R)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/16/2018 EXTENDING the Time, up until and including 10/5/2018, for the Plaintiffs to File a motion for attorneys' fees, related nontaxable expenses, or costs. (York, M)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/8/2018 ORDERING the deadline for Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees, related nontaxable expenses, or costs in this action is hereby EXTENDED by 30 days to 8/31/2018. (Washington, S)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/5/2018 ORDERING the deadline for Plaintiffs to file any motion for attorneys' fees, related nontaxable expenses, or costs in this actions EXTENDED to 8/1/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/7/18, ORDERING the deadline for Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees, related nontaxable expenses, or costs in this action is EXTENDED to 7/2/18. (Kastilahn, A)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/3/2018 ORDERING the deadline for Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees, related nontaxable expenses, or costs in this action is EXTENDED to 6/2/2018. (Hunt, G)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/4/2018 ORDERING the deadline for Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees, related nontaxable expenses, or costs in this action is EXTENDED to 5/3/2018. (Washington, S)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/16/2018 ORDERING pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54, the deadline for Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees, related nontaxable expenses, or costs in this action is hereby extended by 30 days to not later than April 3, 2018. (Becknal, R)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 2/6/18, ORDERING that the deadline for Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees, related nontaxable expenses, or costs in this action is EXTENDED by 30 days to not later than 3/4/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/8/2015 ORDERING that any motion by any party for attorneys' fees, related nontaxable expenses, or costs in this action shall be filed within 30 days of the judgment of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, the dismissal of the appeal for any reason, or the final judgment of this Court on remand, whichever is later. (Zignago, K.)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/25/15: The Court declares the California Civil Code section 1748.1 unconstitutional and permanently enjoins its enforcement. (Kaminski, H)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/8/2014 GRANTING 28 Motion for Leave to File a Memorandum of Law as Amici Curiae. The amici curiae brief attached as Exhibit A to the 28 Motion is sufficiently filed and need not be refiled. (Michel, G)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/5/2014 GRANTING 24 Motion for Leave to File a Memorandum of Law as Amici Curiae. The amici curiae brief attached to the Motion as Exhibit 1 is sufficiently filed and need not be refiled. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Italian Colors Restaurant, et al. v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Italian Colors Restaurant
Represented By: Edward Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Carlson
Represented By: Edward Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurelwood Cleaners, LLC
Represented By: Edward Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Ebrahimian
Represented By: Edward Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Life Corporation
Represented By: Edward Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toshio Chino
Represented By: Edward Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stonecrest Gas & Wash
Represented By: Edward Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salam Razuki
Represented By: Edward Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon's Transmission Service, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Archer
Represented By: Edward Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Represented By: Anthony R Hakl, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?