Washington v. Gustafson, et al.
Plaintiff: Jesse Washington
Defendant: A. Gustafson, S. Walker, C. Blomquist, M. Aquilero, M. Kesler and C. Rimanda
Case Number: 2:2014cv00628
Filed: March 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/21/19 DENYING 79 plaintiff's request for assistance with obtaining discovery documents from defendants and/or to extend discovery dates. (Plummer, M)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/15/19 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Jesse Washington by video conferencing on 6/06/19 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kend all J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento and KJN). (Plummer, M)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/15/2018 SETTING a Settlement Conference on 8/14/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Plaintiff is to appear by video conference from his place of detention. Parties shall submit confidential settlement statement no later than 8/7/2018 in accordance with this order. (cc: CKD, ADR) (Yin, K)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/11/17 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 3/6/17 52 are ADOPTED in full; Defendant Miranda's MOTION for Summary Judgment 29 is GRANTED; and Summary Judgment is GRANTED in full on behalf of Defendant Miranda.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ADOPTING 53 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/31/17 ORDERING that the 30 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: Summary judgment is GRANTED on behalf of Defendant Kesler concerning all deliberate indifference claims; Summary judgment is GRANTED on behalf of Defendant Gustafson concerning the retaliation, deliberate indifference, and excessive force claims arising from the handcuffing of Plaintiff ; Summary judgment is DENIED on behalf of Defendants Aguilera, Blomquist, Gustafson, and Walker concerning the deliberate indifference claims arising from the alleged denial of medical treatment after the use of force incident; Summary judgment i s DENIED on behalf of Defendant Gustafson concerning the excessive force claim arising from his use of pepper spray against Plaintiff; and Summary judgment is DENIED on behalf of Defendants Aguilera, Blomquist, Gustafson, and Walker concerning their qualified immunity defenses. (Benson, A)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/7/2017 RECOMMENDING defendants' 30 motion for summary judgment be granted in part and denied in part; summary judgment be granted on behalf of defendant Kesler con cerning all deliberate indifference claims; summary judgment be granted on behalf of defendant Gustafson concerning the retaliation, deliberate indifference, and excessive force claims arising from the handcuffing of plaintiff; summary judgment be denied on behalf of defendants Aguilera, Blomquist, Gustafson, and Walker concerning the deliberate indifference claims arising from the alleged denial of medical treatment after the use of force incident; summary judgment be denied on behalf of defendant Gustafson concerning the excessive force claim arising from his use of pepper spray against plaintiff; and summary judgment be denied on behalf of defendants Aguilera, Blomquist, Gustafson, and Walker concerning their qualified immunity defenses. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/06/17 recommending that defendant Miranda's motion for summary judgment 29 be granted; and summary judgment be granted in full on behalf of defendant Miranda. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 29 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 02/14/17. (Plummer, M)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/28/15 ORDERING that defendants' motion to modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order is granted. The parties may conduct discovery until January 8, 2016. Any motions necessary to compel discovery shall be filed by that date. All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before February 26, 2016.(Dillon, M)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jesse Washington signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/27/15. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Gustafson, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Blomquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Aquilero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Kesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Rimanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?