Center for Competitive Politics v. Harris

Plaintiff: Center for Competitive Politics
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Case Number: 2:2014cv00636
Filed: March 7, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
0 Judge: Deborah Barnes
1 Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2018 66 AMENDED #65 Notice as to Transcripts by Center for Competitive Politics. (Morgan, Zachary) Modified on 2/8/2018 (Washington, S).
February 6, 2018 65 NOTICE As To Transcripts by Center for Competitive Politics re #62 Notice of Appeal. (Morgan, Zachary)
November 30, 2017 64 USCA CASE NUMBER 17-17403 for #62 Notice of Appeal filed by Center for Competitive Politics. (York, M)
November 30, 2017 63 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #62 Notice of Appeal filed by Center for Competitive Politics. Notice of Appeal filed *11/29/2017*, Complaint filed *3/7/2014* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *10/31/2017*. ** *Fee Status: Paid on 11/29/2017 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Kaminski, H)
November 29, 2017 62 NOTICE of APPEAL by Center for Competitive Politics. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0972-7386948) (Attachments: #1 Statement of Representation)(Dickerson, Allen)
November 29, 2017 61 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Name Change by Center for Competitive Politics. (Morgan, Zachary)
October 31, 2017 60 Featured Case JUDGMENT dated *10/31/17* entered pursuant to order signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/30/17. (Kastilahn, A)
October 31, 2017 59 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/30/17, GRANTING Defendant's #44 Motion to Dismiss. CASE CLOSED(Kastilahn, A) Modified on 10/31/2017 (Kastilahn, A).
June 23, 2017 58 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Center for Competitive Politics. (Dickerson, Allen)
April 19, 2017 57 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Center for Competitive Politics to #56 Order. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dickerson, Allen)
April 13, 2017 56 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/12/2017 ORDERING: Within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order the parties shall meet and confer regarding their discovery plan. All discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed no later than three hundred sixty-five (365) days from the date of this Order. All counsel are to designate in writing and serve upon all other parties the name, address, and area of expertise of each expert that they propose to tender at trial not later than sixty (60) days after the close of discovery. Supplemental List due within thirty (30) days after the designation of expert witnesses. The parties shall file dispositive motions no later than one hundred eighty (180) days after the close of non-expert discovery. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after receiving this Courts ruling(s) on the last filed dispositive motion(s). If the parties do not intend to file dispositive motions, the parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than thirty (30) days after the close of the designation of supplemental expert witnesses. Any objections to Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order are due within seven (7) days from the date of this Order. (Washington, S)
October 4, 2016 55 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 39) and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 44), both scheduled for hearing on October 6, 2016, are submitted without oral argument and the hearing is vacated. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
September 29, 2016 54 REPLY by Center for Competitive Politics re #39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Zac Morgan, #2 Exhibit Morgan Decl, Exh. 1, #3 Exhibit Morgan Decl., Exh. 2, #4 Exhibit Morgan Decl., Exh. 3, #5 Certificate of Service)(Morgan, Zachary)
September 29, 2016 53 REPLY by Kamala Harris re #44 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
September 29, 2016 52 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Zachary Robert Morgan, PHV on behalf of Center for Competitive Politics. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Morgan, Zachary)
September 29, 2016 51 Featured Case PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/27/2016 GRANTING #47 Pro Hac Vice Application. Attorney Zachary Robert Morgan ADDED PHV for Center for Competitive Politics. (Jackson, T)
September 22, 2016 50 OPPOSITION by Center for Competitive Politics to #44 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dickerson, Allen)
September 22, 2016 49 OPPOSITION by Kamala Harris to #39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Eller, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Tania Ibanez, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Declaration of Alexandra Robert Gordon, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Declaration of Kevin A. Calia, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit C, #14 Exhibit D, #15 Exhibit E, #16 Exhibit F, #17 Exhibit G, #18 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra) Modified on 9/23/2016 (Reader, L).
September 22, 2016 48 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy A. Shaddox-Waldrop for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Pro Hac Vice Application #47 . Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the application/proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ first and last name for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Shaddox-Waldrop, A)
September 22, 2016 47 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Center for Competitive Politics for attorney Zachary Robert Morgan to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-6684663) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gura, Alan)
September 21, 2016 46 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jose Alfonso Zelidon-Zepeda on behalf of Kamala Harris. Attorney Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose Alfonso added. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
September 21, 2016 45 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kevin A. Calia on behalf of Kamala Harris. Attorney Calia, Kevin A. added. (Calia, Kevin)
September 8, 2016 44 MOTION to DISMISS by Kamala Harris. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtoom 7, before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Alexandra Robert Gordon, #2 Proposed Order) (Gordon, Alexandra) Modified on 9/9/2016 (Jackson, T).
August 25, 2016 43 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/24/2016 ORDERING that Defendant's last day to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be no later than 21 days after entry of this Court's order regarding the #39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Jackson, T)
August 19, 2016 42 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 40). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
August 19, 2016 41 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
August 19, 2016 40 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
August 19, 2016 39 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Center for Competitive Politics. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Dickerson, Allen)
August 12, 2016 38 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Center for Competitive Politics re #37 Amended Complaint. (Dickerson, Allen)
August 12, 2016 37 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kamala Harris by Center for Competitive Politics. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Keating, #2 Exhibit)(Dickerson, Allen)
August 2, 2016 36 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill: Due to the appointment of *Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan* to Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes for all further proceedings. (Benson, A)
July 13, 2016 35 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Judicial Assistant for District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/13/2016: Having reviewed the parties' 5/2/2016 Joint Status Report #34 and good cause appearing, the Court's stay of this matter issued 2/23/16 #33 is hereby LIFTED. Plaintiff is directed to file any Amended Complaint not later than 8/12/2016. In addition, the parties are directed to file a further Joint Status Report not later than 8/19/2016 which addresses the further disposition of this case as set forth in the Court's 3/10/2014 Order Requiring Joint Status Report #4 .(Espana-Purpur, A)
May 2, 2016 34 STATUS REPORT by Center for Competitive Politics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proof of Service)(Dickerson, Allen)
February 23, 2016 33 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/22/2016 STAYING this action for at least 14 days after the entry of final judgment in Americans for Prosperity Foundation v. Harris, No. 2:14-cv-09448-R-FFM (C.D. Ca.); ORDERING the parties to promptly notify the Court upon the issuance of final judgment in said case. CASE STAYED. (Michel, G.)
February 19, 2016 32 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The court received the Joint Status Report and Proposed Order (ECF No. 31). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
February 5, 2016 31 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Center for Competitive Politics. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Dickerson, Allen)
January 15, 2016 30 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The parties are directed to file a joint status report as to the current posture of this matter, not later than, February 5, 2016. (Deutsch, S)
November 16, 2015 28 USCA MANDATE as to #18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (14-15978): The judgment of this Court, entered 5/1/2015 takes effect this date. (Michel, G.)
November 6, 2015 27 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the elevation of Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd to the position of District Judge, this action is temporarily assigned to *Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan*. (Zignago, K.)
May 1, 2015 26 OPINION of USCA for #18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by plaintiff Center for Competitive Politics: The District Court's denial of CCP's #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is AFFIRMED. (Marciel, M)
June 2, 2014 25 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4-17-14, before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr, filed by Court Reporter Michelle Babbitt, E-mail mbabbitt@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Reporter Babbitt or PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 6/23/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2014. (Babbitt, M)
May 29, 2014 24 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/28/14. Case STAYED pending resolution and issuance of mandate by the Ninth Circuit regarding plaintiff's preliminary injunction appeal. (Manzer, C)
May 21, 2014 23 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Staying District Court Proceedings Pending Preliminary Injunction Appeal by Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gordon, Alexandra)
May 21, 2014 22 USCA CASE NUMBER 14-15978 for #18 Notice of Appeal filed by Center for Competitive Politics. (Zignago, K.)
May 19, 2014 21 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Center for Competitive Politics. Notice of Appeal filed *5/15/2014*, Complaint filed *3/7/2014* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *5/14/2014*. Court Reporter: *Michelle Babbitt*. *Fee Status: Paid on 5/15/2014 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Kastilahn, A)
May 15, 2014 20 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Center for Competitive Politics for proceedings held on 17 April 2014 before Judge England, re #18 Notice of Appeal (Dickerson, Allen)
May 15, 2014 19 STATEMENT of Representation by Plaintiff Center for Competitive Politics re #18 Notice of Appeal. (Dickerson, Allen)
May 15, 2014 18 NOTICE of INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Center for Competitive Politics as to #17 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0972-5328195) (Dickerson, Allen) Modified on 5/19/2014 (Kastilahn, A).
May 14, 2014 17 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/13/2014 DENYING #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Donati, J)
April 17, 2014 16 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: MOTION HEARING held on 4/17/2014. After argument from counsel the Court submitted the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 9). A written order is forthcoming. Plaintiff's Counsel Allen Dickerson and Alan Gura, present. Defendant's Counsel Alexandra Gordon, present. Court Reporter: Michelle Babbitt. Interpreter none present. (Deutsch, S)
April 15, 2014 15 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 9) is CONTINUED to 3:00 p.m. on April 17, 2014 in Courtroom 7. (Deutsch, S)
April 14, 2014 14 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Kamala Harris re #13 Response. (Gordon, Alexandra)
April 14, 2014 13 RESPONSE by Kamala Harris to #9 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION . (Attachments: #1 Opinion)(Gordon, Alexandra)
April 11, 2014 12 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 9, is confirmed for Thursday, April 17, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7 at the Robert T. Matsui Federal Courthouse. Personal appearances are required. Each side shall be limited to twenty (20) minutes, and counsel should be prepared to discuss, inter alia: (1) whether permitting the state to require the requested donor information directly from Plaintiff would frustrate the full purposes and objectives of Congress in enacting 26 U.S.C. 6104; (2) whether Plaintiff is required to make the prima facie showing set forth in Brock v. Local 375, Plumbers Int'l Union of Am., AFL-CIO, 860 F.2d 346, 350 (9th Cir. 1988), to succeed on its Freedom of Association claim; and (3) how Plaintiff would suffer irreparable harm and how the equities would balance if the Court were to find that the Attorney General's request is preempted by federal law rather than unconstitutional under the first amendment. (Deutsch, S)
April 10, 2014 11 REPLY by Center for Competitive Politics re #10 Opposition to Motion,. (Dickerson, Allen)
April 3, 2014 10 OPPOSITION to #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Kamala Harris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra Robert Gordon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Declaration of Kevis Foley, #9 Certificate of Service) (Gordon, Alexandra) Modified on 4/4/2014 (Michel, G).
March 20, 2014 9 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Center for Competitive Politics. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of David Keating, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Dickerson, Allen) Modified on 3/21/2014 (Meuleman, A).
March 18, 2014 8 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/18/14. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to no later than 21 days after entry of this Court's order regarding the motion for preliminary injunction. (Manzer, C)
March 17, 2014 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Kamala Harris. Attorney Gordon, Alexandra Robert added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record)(Gordon, Alexandra)
March 17, 2014 6 Featured Case PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/17/14: Added attorney Allen Dickerson, PHV for the Center for Competitive Politics. (Kaminski, H)
March 12, 2014 5 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order (ECF No. 2). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. (Deutsch, S)
March 10, 2014 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
March 10, 2014 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kamala Harris* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alan Gura* *Gura & Possessky PLLC* *105 Oronoco Street, Suite 305* *Alexandria, VA 22314*. (Kaminski, H)
March 7, 2014 2 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Center for Competitive Politics for attorney Allen Dickerson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-5216740) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gura, Alan)
March 7, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against Kamala Harris by Center for Competitive Politics. Attorney Gura, Alan added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-5216696) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gura, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Competitive Politics v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Competitive Politics
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: Allen Dickerson, PHV
Represented By: Zachary Robert Morgan, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Represented By: Kevin A. Calia
Represented By: Jose Alfonso Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?