February 14, 2019 |
Filing
94
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/13/2019 GRANTING 93 Motion to Continue. The Judgment Debtor Exam is CONTINUED to 5/17/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Zignago, K.)
|
November 6, 2018 |
Filing
89
ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/5/2018 ORDERING Karl Vuong to appear for Judgment Debtor Exam set for 1/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Zignago, K.)
|
August 6, 2018 |
Filing
84
DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Karl Vuong pursuant to order signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/3/2018. (Zignago, K.)
|
July 11, 2018 |
Filing
82
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 07/11/18 RECOMMENDING that the 79 Motion for Default Judgment against Karl Vuong be granted; that Judgment be entered against defendant Karl Vuong; that Karl Vuong be orde red to pay $12,000 in statutory damages; that defendant be ordered to correct the violations at the Mariscos Mazatlan identified in plaintiff's first amended complaint, to the extent that defendant has the legal right to do so, so that the facility is readily accessible to and usable by individuals with disabilities; that defendant be ordered to pay plaintiff $3,660 in attorneys' fees and costs and that this case be closed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Benson, A.)
|
September 21, 2017 |
Filing
75
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/20/2017 DENYING 73 Motion for Default Judgment without prejudice to renewal; VACATING the hearing on said motion set for 9/22/2017. (Michel, G.)
|
August 11, 2017 |
Filing
72
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/10/2017 SANCTIONING Defendant Karl Vuong in the amount of $250.00, payable to the Clerk of Court, within fourteen (14) days. (cc: Financial) (Michel, G.)
|
May 16, 2017 |
Filing
70
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/16/17, ORDERING that the court GRANTS plaintiff's 66 motion and DISMISSES the Chow defendants from this action with prejudice, with all sides bearing their own attorneys fees and costs. Defendants Warren Chow, Jr., Bonnie Chow and Karen Kwai Suen Chow TERMED. (Kastilahn, A) (Main Document 70 replaced on 5/16/2017) (Kastilahn, A).
|
April 12, 2017 |
Filing
65
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/12/2017 ORDERING Defendant Karl Vuong to show cause within fourteen (14) days why he should not be sanctioned in the amount of $250.00 for failing to appear at the status conference. (Michel, G.)
|
December 21, 2016 |
Filing
58
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/20/16 ORDERING that This matter is referred back to the District Judge assigned to this action pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(21); All dates pending before the undersigned are vacated; and the caption on documents filed in this action shall be No. 2:14-cv-0709 KJM DB with the "PS" designation being eliminated.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
September 9, 2016 |
Filing
46
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/8/16 ORDERING that the parties show cause no later than 9/16/16 why the case should not be dismissed and why the parties should not be sanctioned in the amount of $250.00 each for failing to comply with the court's 6/13/16 order (ECF No. 43 ).(Becknal, R)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
27
ORDER granting 21 Motion to set aside the default signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/25/15: Defendants shall file their responsive pleading within fourteen days of this order. (Kaminski, H)
|
August 5, 2014 |
Filing
10
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/4/2014 GRANTING 8 Motion for Service by Publication. Plaintiff is directed to serve defendant Karl Vuong by publication in The Sacramento Bee. See CAL. CIV. CODE § 415.50(b). Plaintiff is furthe r directed to mail a copy of the summons, the complaint, and the order for publication to defendant Vuong at all addresses available for him. Finally, plaintiff shall comply with California Government Code section 6064, which provides that the publication in the newspaper must occur once a week for four successive weeks. (Zignago, K.)
|