Jameson Beach Property Owners Association et al v. US Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Jameson Beach Property Owners Association, Gene Landon and Helen Nicolaides
Defendant: Ronald G Kettner, David Meyers, Nancy G Gibson and United States Forest Service
Case Number: 2:2014cv00718
Filed: March 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 30:1201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/13/17 ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and each of the Parties shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs for this litigation. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' status report (ECF No. 97-1) in which they ask this Court to continue the stay of proceedings currently in effect, the stay of proceedings is continued to November 29, 2016. If the parties have not submitted a fi nal, executed Settlement Agreement by that time, they are directed to appear before this Court on December 1, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. to show cause why this case has not been settled and to provide input on a date certain on which the Court will require the submission of a finalized and executed Settlement Agreement. The previously set hearing for November 17, 2016 is hereby vacated. Signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/15/2016. (Deutsch, S)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/19/16 ORDERING that the STAY of proceedings is CONTINUED to 11/04/16; if the parties have not submitted a final, executed Settlement Agreement for the Court's approval prior to 11/ 04/16, the parties are directed to appear 11/10/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. to show cause why this case has not been settled and to provide input on a date certain on which the Court will require the submission of a finalized and executed Settlement Agreement. (Benson, A)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/12/2016 ORDERING that the STAY of proceedings is CONTINUED to 8/5/2016. If the parties do not have a final, executed Settlement Agreement prior to 8/5/2016, the parties are directed to file a joint status report no later than 8/12/2016. (Zignago, K.)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 02/10/16 ORDERING stay of proceedings EXTENDED to 4/29/16. If the parties do not have a final executed Settlement Agreement prior to 4/29/16, the parties are directed to file a joint status report no later than 5/6/16. (Jackson, T)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/13/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiffs Gene Landon and Helen Nicolaides are hereby DISMISSED from the instant matter. Jameson Beach Property Owners Association is now the sole remaining Plaintiff in this case. (Zignago, K.)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/5/2015 ORDERING 85 the STAY of proceedings shall continue until 1/22/2016, and, if the case does not settle during this period of time, the parties are directed to file a joint status report no later than 1/29/2016.(Reader, L)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/19/15 ORDERING that the Parties' Request to continue the stay currently in effect, to stay of proceedings 77 is CONTINUED to 9/18/2015. If the case does not settle during this period of time, the parties are directed to file a joint status report no later than 9/25/2015.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/28/14. 44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer is DENIED as moot. 46 Application for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Response to complaint due no later than 7/1/14. The hearing as to 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is reset for 6/12/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jameson Beach Property Owners Association et al v. US Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald G Kettner
Represented By: Julie S. Thrower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Meyers
Represented By: Julie S. Thrower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy G Gibson
Represented By: Julie S. Thrower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Julie S. Thrower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jameson Beach Property Owners Association
Represented By: Jacqueline Mittelstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Landon
Represented By: Jacqueline Mittelstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Nicolaides
Represented By: Jacqueline Mittelstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?