Molera et al v. City of Vacaville et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Molera, D. W. and William Walker
Defendant: City of Vacaville, Richard Word, Kenji, Valk, Patrick Williams, Debi Lopez and Daniel Torres
Case Number: 2:2014cv00782
Filed: March 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 06/15/15 ORDERING having reviewed the Stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing, it is hereby ordered that plaintiffs' second amended complaint and action herein is dismissed in full and with prejudice in its entirety as to all defendants, each party to bear their own costs and fees. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R) Modified on 6/17/2015 (Becknal, R).
June 11, 2015 Filing 40 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by City of Vacaville, Kenji, Debi Lopez, Daniel Torres, Valk, Patrick Williams, Richard Word. (Osman, Richard)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/8/2015 GRANTING #32 Motion to Approve Minor's Compromise. (Zignago, K.)
May 5, 2015 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Pursuant to the representations of the attorney for Plaintiffs, the Court determined this case is settled. In accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, dispositional documents are to be filed on or before July 6, 2015. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. Accordingly, the March 3, 2016, Final Pretrial Conference and the April 18, 2016, jury trial are vacated. (Deutsch, S)
May 4, 2015 Filing 37 PROPOSED ORDER re #36 Ex Parte Application to Shortening Time re: #32 Unopposed Motion to Approve Minor's Compromise by Leslie Molera, D. W., William Walker. (Sherwin, Julia) Modified on 5/6/2015 (Zignago, K.).
May 4, 2015 Filing 36 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time re: #32 Unopposed Motion to Approve Minor's Compromise by Leslie Molera, D. W., William Walker. (Sherwin, Julia) Modified on 5/6/2015 (Zignago, K.).
May 4, 2015 Filing 35 PROPOSED ORDER re #32 Motion to Approve Minor's Compromise. (Sherwin, Julia) Modified on 5/6/2015 (Zignago, K.).
May 4, 2015 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Julia Sherwin in SUPPORT OF #32 MOTION to Approve Minor's Compromise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sherwin, Julia)
May 4, 2015 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Luana Silva in SUPPORT OF #32 MOTION to Approve Minor's Compromise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, Waldorf School website, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, Waldorf School website, continued)(Sherwin, Julia)
May 4, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION to Approve Minor's Compromise by Leslie Molera, D. W., William Walker. (Sherwin, Julia)
May 1, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Leslie Molera, D. W., William Walker. (Haddad, Michael)
March 4, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Unavailability of Plaintiffs' Counsel, Amended by Leslie Molera, D. W., William Walker. (Sherwin, Julia)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/23/15 ORDERING that the Settlement Conference is CONTINUED to 5/18/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The parties will submit confidential settlement-conference statements to Judge Delaney's chambers on or before 5/11/2015. (Kastilahn, A)
February 20, 2015 Filing 28 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER continuing the Settlement Conference re #26 Pretrial Scheduling Order by Leslie Molera, D. W., William Walker. (Haddad, Michael) Modified on 2/23/2015 (Michel, G.).
February 20, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL by Leslie Molera, D. W., William Walker. (Sherwin, Julia) Modified on 2/23/2015 (Michel, G.).
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/26/2014 ORDERING: Discovery due by 6/18/2015; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 8/18/2015; Last day to hear Dispositive Motions is 12/17/2015; Settlement Conference set for 3/9/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr; and Jury Trial set for 4/18/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.(Donati, J)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/29/14. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/21/14. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 21, 2014 Filing 22 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Confidential Documents by Leslie Molera, D. W., William Walker. (Helm, Thomas)
September 10, 2014 Filing 21 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: defendants Debi Lopez, Daniel Torres, and Patrick Williams Waiver sent on 7/2/2014, answer due 9/2/2014. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service for Debi Lopez, #2 Waiver of Service for Patrick Williams, #3 Waiver of Service for Daniel Torres) (Helm, Thomas) Modified on 9/11/2014 (Marciel, M)
September 5, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE of unavailability of Plaintiffs' Counsel by Leslie Molera, D. W., William Walker. (Sherwin, Julia) Modified on 9/8/2014 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 26, 2014 Filing 19 ANSWER to #13 Second Amended Complaint by Debi Lopez. Attorney Bertrand, Thomas F ADDED. (Bertrand, Thomas) Modified on 8/26/2014 (Donati, J).
July 30, 2014 Filing 18 ANSWER by City of Vacaville, Kenji, Daniel Torres, Valk, Patrick Williams, Richard Word to #13 Amended Complaint. Attorney Crawford, Sheila Dana'e added. (Crawford, Sheila) Modified on 7/31/2014 (Donati, J).
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 7/22/14 ORDERING that the time for Defendants to answer the Second Amended Complaint shall be EXTENDED to 7/30/2014. (Kastilahn, A)
July 16, 2014 Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by City of Vacaville, Kenji, Daniel Torres, Valk, Patrick Williams, Richard Word. Attorney Osman, Richard W. added. (Osman, Richard)
July 15, 2014 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT by City of Vacaville, Kenji, Valk, Richard Word. (Osman, Richard)
July 2, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Debi Lopez, Daniel Torres, Patrick Williams* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Joseph Haddad* *Haddad & Sherwin* *505 Seventeenth Street* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Becknal, R)
July 2, 2014 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Leslie Molera, William Walker, D. W..(Haddad, Michael)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/24/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs file a second amended complaint on or before 7/3/2014. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/25/2014 re #10 Stipulation and Proposed Order filed by D. W., Leslie Molera, William Walker ORDERING the Request to modify the Order Requiring Joint Status Report is GRANTED; parties shall confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) by July 1, 2014 and to submit to the Court a Joint Status Report by July 15, 2014. (Waggoner, D)
June 24, 2014 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Requesting Modification of Order Requiring Joint Status Report re #3 Civil New Case Documents for MCE by Leslie Molera, D. W., William Walker. (Haddad, Michael)
June 12, 2014 Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Permission to File Second Amended Complaint by City of Vacaville, Kenji, Valk, Richard Word. (Osman, Richard)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER #7 for extension of time signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/21/2014. Defendants shall respond to #4 First Amended Complaint by 6/12/2014. (Marciel, M)
May 14, 2014 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER extending time to respond to #4 First Amended Complaint by all defendants. Attorney Osman, Richard W. added. (Osman, Richard) Modified on 5/22/2014 (Marciel, M)
April 30, 2014 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: City of Vacaville served on 4/4/2014; Kenji served on 4/29/2014; Valk served on 4/17/2014; Richard Word served on 4/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service for Defendant Kingi, #2 Proof of Service for Defendant City of Vacaville, #3 Proof of Service for Defendant Word, #4 Waiver of Service for Defendant Valk)(Helm, Thomas) Modified on 5/1/2014 (Manzer, C).
April 29, 2014 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Luana Silva re #4 Amended Complaint. (Haddad, Michael)
April 29, 2014 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Leslie Molera, William Walker, D. W..(Haddad, Michael)
March 26, 2014 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
March 26, 2014 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Vacaville, Kenji, Valk, Richard Word* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael J. Haddad* *Haddad & Sherwin* *505 17th Street* *Oakland, California 94612*. (Reader, L)
March 26, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Leslie Molera, William Walker, D. W.. Attorney Haddad, Michael Joseph added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haddad, Michael)
March 26, 2014 RECEIPT number #0972-5247616 for $400.00 for Civil Filing from Michael J. Haddad. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molera et al v. City of Vacaville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Molera
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Represented By: Genevieve K. Guertin
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Thomas Kennedy Helm, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. W.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Represented By: Genevieve K. Guertin
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Thomas Kennedy Helm, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Walker
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Represented By: Genevieve K. Guertin
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Thomas Kennedy Helm, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vacaville
Represented By: Richard W. Osman
Represented By: Sheila Dana'e Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Word
Represented By: Richard W. Osman
Represented By: Sheila Dana'e Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenji
Represented By: Richard W. Osman
Represented By: Sheila Dana'e Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valk
Represented By: Richard W. Osman
Represented By: Sheila Dana'e Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Williams
Represented By: Richard W. Osman
Represented By: Sheila Dana'e Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debi Lopez
Represented By: Richard W. Osman
Represented By: Sheila Dana'e Crawford
Represented By: Thomas F Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Torres
Represented By: Richard W. Osman
Represented By: Sheila Dana'e Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?