Concrete Washout Systems, Inc., v. Terrell Moran, Inc., et al.,
Plaintiff: |
Concrete Washout Systems, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Terrell Moran, Inc., Terrell Moran, Todd Termini, TMI Services Trucks & Equipment Rentals LLC and TMI Concrete Washout Trucks & Equipment Rentals LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv00830 |
Filed: |
April 2, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Carolyn K. Delaney |
Presiding Judge: |
William B. Shubb |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1126 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 25, 2015 |
Filing
42
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/25/2015 ORDERING 24 that the motion of defendants Trucks and Equipment Rentals, LLC and Trucks and Machinery for Industry, LLC to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED, and this action is hereby DISMISSED as against said defendants. (Reader, L)
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/13/2015 GRANTING 38 Defendants' Request for counsel Elizabeth Ashley to appear by telephone at the 2/23/2015 status conference set for 2:00 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall e-mail counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
February 3, 2015 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/3/2015 GRANTING 32 defendants' counsel's request to appear telephonically at the hearing on the motion to dismiss complaint set for 2/9/2015 at 2:00 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall e-mail counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
January 15, 2015 |
Filing
27
STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/14/15: Discovery due by 3/2/2015. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/2/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Bench Trial set for 3/8/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
|
September 24, 2014 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/24/2014 GRANTING 16 Request for Elizabeth Ashley to appear telephonically at the status conference hearing set for 10/14/2014 at 2:00 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall e-mail counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
August 5, 2014 |
Filing
14
STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/5/14 ORDERING that Entry of Default 9 is SET ASIDE; Defendants, Terrell Moran and Terrell Moran, Inc. will have until 8/8/2014 to file an answer to thecomplaint in the matter. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?