Ellis v. Abdur-Rahman et al
Plaintiff: Robert Ellis
Defendant: Abdur-Rahman and D. Swindle
Case Number: 2:2014cv00852
Filed: April 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/30/2017 RECOMMENDING that Defendant's 21 motion for summary judgment be granted. Summary judgment be granted in full on behalf of defendant. Motion referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/11/2016 DIRECTING the Clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b). Assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/08/16 ordering that within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion for summary judgment filed on behalf of the defendant. (Plummer, M)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/5/15 ORDERING that Defendants motion to modify the courts discovery and scheduling order (Doc. No. 19 ) is granted; Defendant shall file a dispositive motion in this case on or before November 2, 2015. No further extensions of time will be granted for this purpose; and except as otherwise stated in this order, the courts discovery and scheduling order remains in effect.(Dillon, M)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/20/15 ordering that within 10 days of the date of service of this order defendant Ellis shall file a status report in this case indicating how defendant intends to proceed. (Plummer, M)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/11/14 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Robert Ellis and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial). (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Abdur-Rahman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdur-Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Swindle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?