Maxey v. United States, et al.
Plaintiff: James C. Maxey
Defendant: United States and Barack Obama
Case Number: 2:2014cv00900
Filed: April 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/2/2015 RELATING this case to the actions denominated 2:13-cv-02620 JAM EFB (PS), 2:14-cv-02206 KJM EFB (PS), 2:14-cv-02507 MCE AC (PS), 2:14-cv-02577 GEB CKD (PS), 2:14-cv-02606 MCE EFB (PS), 2:1 4-cv-02802 TLN KJN (PS), 2:14-cv-02803 GEB CKD (PS), 2:14-cv-02872 MCE DAD (PS), 2:14-cv-02996 TLN AC (PS), 2:15-cv-00326 GEB EFB (PS), 2:15-cv-00552 JAM EFB (PS), and 2:15-cv-00641 TLN GGH (PS); REASSIGNING the cases denominated 2:14-cv-02206 KJM EF B (PS), 2:14-cv-02507 MCE AC (PS), 2:14-cv-02577 GEB CKD (PS), 2:14-cv-02606 MCE EFB (PS), 2:14-cv-02802 TLN KJN (PS), 2:14-cv-02803 GEB CKD (PS), 2:14-cv-02872 MCE DAD (PS), 2:14-cv-02996 TLN AC (PS), 2:15-cv-00326 GEB EFB (PS),and 2:15-cv-00641 TLN GGH (PS) to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings; VACATING all dates currently set the reassigned cases only; ORDERING that the caption on all documents filed henceforth in the reassigned cas es be shown as 2:14-cv-02206 JAM EFB (PS), 2:14-cv-02507 JAM EFB (PS), 2:14-cv-02577 JAM EFB (PS), 2:14-cv-02606 JAM EFB (PS), 2:14-cv-02802 JAM EFB (PS), 2:14-cv-02803 JAM EFB (PS), 2:14-cv-02872 JAM EFB (PS), 2:14-cv-02996 JAM EFB (PS), 2:15-cv-00326 JAM EFB (PS),and 2:15-cv-00641 JAM EFB (PS); ORDERING the Clerk of Court to make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Michel, G.)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/28/2014 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and REASSIGNING this action to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. It is HEREBY RECOMMENDED that the 1 Complaint be dismissed without leave to amend and that the clerk be directed to close the case. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Referred to District Judge John A. Mendez. Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman no longer assigned to case. (Donati, J)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/14/14 DENYING 1 Motion for TRO. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxey v. United States, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?