February 27, 2018 |
Filing
124
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/27/2018 GRANTING The parties request of 60 days from the date of this filing of this order to secure the remaining necessary signature on the Settlement Agreement and to subsequently file the Dismissal of the case. (Reader, L)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing
121
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/18/17: The parties' stipulation 120 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion in limine one 96 is DENIED as MOOT. Plaintiffs' amended motion in limine three 110 is DENIED. Defendants' motion in limine one 93 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' motion in limine two 94 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties' stipulation 117 is GRANTED.(Kaminski, H)
|
August 2, 2017 |
Filing
91
STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/2/2017 ORDERING that the depositions of Dr. Barbour and Dr. Posey be taken off calendar.(Michel, G.)
|
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
83
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/11/17 ORDERING that a subsequent informal telephonic discovery conference is set for Thursday, 07/13/17, at 9:30 a.m. (with the parties to inform the court by 9:00 a.m. that day whether the con ference is still needed). Prior to the next conference, plaintiffs' counsel shall provide defendants' counsel dates, times, and locations for the depositions of: Sayee McCarthy; Landis Cooke; Hans Madave; and Mr. Roger Clark. Plaintiffs 9; counsel shall prepare a joint statement and proposed stipulation to modify discovery deadlines, on behalf of the parties which shall be due to the court no later than 9:00 a.m. on 07/13/17. The following depositions will move forward as scheduled, with court reporters to be provided by defendants: Dr. Bennet Omalu on 07/14/17, at 9:00 a.m.; Sheila Blakely-Sinclair on 07/17/17, at 1:30 p.m.; Dr. Werner Spitz on 07/18/17, at 10:30 a.m., at Dr. Spitz's office outside of Detroit, MI. (Plaintiffs' counsel shall insure that defendants have the address of Dr. Spitz's office.); Dr. Alan Barbour on 07/31/17, at 10:00 a.m. and Dr. BL Posey on 07/21/17, at 12:00 p.m. (Benson, A)
|
March 6, 2017 |
Filing
64
ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER TO ALLOW FOR PHASED DISCOVERY signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/3/17, ORDERING that each party shall take up to five fact discovery depositions. The parties shall exchange liability and causation expe rt witness reports confidentially subject to the mediation privilege by 4/14/2017. The parties shall confer after the confidential exchange of liability and causation by 4/21/2017, regarding whether to engage in further settlement discussions. Fol lowing the meet and confer, the parties shall notify Magistrate Judge Newman if they decide to engage in a further settlement conference, in which case the settlement conference shall be completed by 5/26/2017. Should the case not resolve at a further settlement conference, the Court shall adopt the modifications to its Scheduling Order set forth in section (d) of this Order. (Kastilahn, A)
|
August 18, 2016 |
Filing
37
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/18/16 ORDERING that the Settlement Conference is RESET for 1/18/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Benson, A)
|
August 10, 2015 |
Filing
28
STIPULATION and ORDER TO PROTECT CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/10/15 ORDERING that Paragraph 8 is DISAPPROVED. The designation of a particular document as confidential pursuant to this order does not a utomatically entitle the parties to file such a document with the court under seal. The parties must comply with Local Rule 141 with respect to requests to seal documents. Pursuant to Local Rule 141.1(f), the court will not retain jurisdiction over enforcement of the terms of this protective order after the action is terminated. Any provision to the contrary in paragraph 11 is DISAPPROVED. (Benson, A)
|
May 5, 2015 |
Filing
15
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/5/2015. Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE within 14 days why they should not be sanctioned for not filing an Opposition or Notice of Non-Opposition to 13 Motion to Dismiss. The Motion Hearing is VACATED pending response to Order to Show Cause. (Marciel, M)
|
February 12, 2015 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/11/2015 ORDERING that the parties file a joint status report within seven days. (Zignago, K.)
|