Giddens v. City of Suisun et al
Plaintiff: Richard Giddens
Defendant: City of Suisun, Suisun City Council, Suzanne Bragdon, Suisun City Attorney, Suisun Police Department, Edmond Dashido, Tim Mattos, Andrew White and Michael Urlaub
Case Number: 2:2014cv00943
Filed: April 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/23/2020 ORDERING plaintiff to file a status report no later than 2/5/2020, updating the court on the status of this case and proposing a case schedule for the resolution of all outstanding matters. If plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Zignago, K.)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/27/18 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 2/5/18 112 are ADOPTED in full; Public Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 107 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follo ws: (a) GRANTED as to Claims One (Fourth Amendment Unlawful Arrest), Four (First Amendment), Seven (Monell), Ten (False Arrest/False Imprisonment), and Fifteen (Unruh Civil Rights Act); (b) DENIED as to Claims Two (Fourth Amendment Excessive Force ), Nine (Assault and Battery), Thirteen (Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress), and Fourteen (Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress) against Defendants Mattos and Urlaub; and The following Defendants Dadisho, White, Sanchez, Day, Hudson, the City of Suisun, the Suisun City Council, and the Suisun City Police Department are TERMINATED from this case. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/2/2018 RECOMMENDING that the public defendants' 107 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted in part and denied in part; Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 21 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/18/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment against defendant Bluford, 98 is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff may again move for default judgment when all other claims against other defendants have been fully a djudicated. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/5/2017 ORDERING the last day discovery motions will be heard is 10/18/2017; Discovery due by 11/1/2017; Dispositive Motions filed by 11/22/2017, last date for law and motion to be heard is 12/20/20 17; Joint Mid-Litigation Statement due by 10/18/2017; Joint Pretrial Statement by 2/8/2018; and Final Pretrial Conference is Reset for 2/22/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; all other dates set forth in the Court's Prior Scheduling Order 64 and Scheduling Amendment 82 will remain unchanged.(Reader, L)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/14/17, ORDERING that Defendants' 83 Motion to Compel Mental Examination is GRANTED. Defendants request that plaintiff's "ADA Advocate" be barred from the exam room whi le the mental health examination is conducted is GRANTED. The Rule 35 examination will be audio recorded, using a device provided by either of the parties or by the examiner. Both parties will have equal access to or copies of the audio recording of the mental examination. (Kastilahn, A)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/6/2017 GRANTING 90 Request to Seal, the 85 Defendants Expert Disclosure is SEALED. Defendants shall IMMEDIATELY file an appropriately redacted version of the Expert Disclosure. (Donati, J)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/26/2017 ORDERING that the requested extension of time for expert disclosure is GRANTED IN PART. The court's 64 scheduling order is MODIFIED to reflect: The last day for disclosure of expe rt witnesses is 6/30/2017; The last day for disclosure of rebuttal expert witnesses is 7/31/2017; All other portions of the Scheduling Order that address Expert Disclosures will remain unchanged; The last day discovery motions will be heard is 9/16/2017; Discovery will be completed by 9/30/2017; The Joint-Mid Litigation Statement is due by 9/16/2017; All other dates set forth in the court's Scheduling Order will remain unchanged. (Zignago, K.)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/27/2017. (Zignago, K.)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/27/2017 DENYING 67 Motion for Default Judgment. The hearing on this motion, currently scheduled for 2/1/2017, is VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/21/2016 ORDERING the Clerk to STRIKE 59 Letter and DELETE it from the docket. (Donati, J)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/19/16 DISCHARGING 57 Order to Show Cause. ORDERING Plaintiff's "ADA Assistant" may sit at counsel table to assist plaintiff at the status conference. The assistant shall not argue on plaintiff's behalf. Nor shall the assistant otherwise address the court, unless specifically requested by the court to do so.(Washington, S)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/17/16 ORDERING the Initial Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 11/9/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; and plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing by 10/26/16, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff may satisfy this OSC by filing his Status Report by 10/26/16. Alternatively, if plaintiff has no dispute with the Status Report filed by the City Defendants, he may file a statement joining that report by 10/26/16. (Benson, A)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/10/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's "Motion for Default Judgment" (ECF No. 52 ) is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal in proper form. (Becknal, R)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER adopting 46 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/22/16: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 38 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part and the proposed Second Amended Complaint 39 , is DEEMED to be the operative complaint. Plaintiff is ordered to serve the Second Amended Complaint on Defendants Sanchez, Day and Hudson. (Kaminski, H)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/4/16 ORDERING that the Clerk strike 42 the Third Amended Complaint from the docket. Plaintiff's 38 Motion To Amend, should be GRANTED in part an d DENIED in part, and the proposed 39 Second Amended Complaint should be DEEMED to be the operative complaint as detailed in this order. Matter referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 2/5/2016 (Kastilahn, A).
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/29/16 ORDERING 42 Third Amended Complaint STRICKEN. It is hereby RECOMMENDED (1) Plaintiffs 38 Motion to Amend is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and th e proposed 39 Second Amended Complaint is DEEMED the operative complaint, (2) GRANTING the Motion to Amend to add Defendants (other than Bragdon, Segala, Wilson and Taylor), (3) ORDERING Plaintiff to serve the Second Amended Complaint on Defendants Sanchez, Day and Hudson. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Jackson, T)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/6/2015 ORDERING that, no later than 30 days from the date of this order, defendant shall file and serve an opposition, or a statement of non-opposition, to plaintiff's 38 motion to amend, treating the 39 Second Amended Complaint as the proposed amended complaint. Plaintiff shall file and serve his reply, if any, no later than 14 days from the date the opposition is filed. At that point, the matter will be taken under submission or scheduled for a hearing. (Zignago, K.)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/23/2015 ADOPTING IN FULL 35 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING 27 Motion to Dismiss as to the Equal Protection claim (Claim 3); DENYING 27 Motion to Dismiss as to the First Amendment claim (Claim 4); GRANTING 27 Motion to Dismiss as to the conspiracy claim (Claim 5); GRANTING 27 Motion to Dismiss as to the failure to prevent the conspiracy claim (Claim 6); DISMISSING WITH LEAVE TO AMEND Claims 3, 5, and 6; GRANTING 27 Motion to D ismiss as to the Separation of Powers claim (Claim 14); DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE Claim 14; INFORMING the plaintiff that leave to amend is limited to the claims specified; DIRECTING the plaintiff that an amendment to add new claims shall require leave of court pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 15(a)(2). (Michel, G.)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/20/2015 GRANTING 29 Motion to Quash; QUASHING the subpoena issued on 12/22/2014 and served on 12/26/2014; NOTIFYING the moving non-parties that they have no obligation to comply with or further respond to said subpoena; VACATING the motion hearing on 29 Motion to Quash set for 2/25/2015. (Michel, G.)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/17/15 recommending that Motion to Dismiss be granted in part and denied in part. F&R referred to Judge Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one days. (Kaminski, H)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/20/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. Failure to file an amended complaint in accordance with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Kastilahn, A)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/17/2014 ADOPTING IN FULL 19 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 6 Motion to Dismiss. (Michel, G)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, recommending defendants' 6 Motion to Dismiss 1 Complaint be granted in part and denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/20/2014. These Findings and Recommendation are SUBMITTED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Within 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendatinos, any party may file written Objections with Court and serve a copy on all parties. (Marciel, M)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENT(S) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/19/14. The Plaintiff's 8 Request to Seal is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court will return the proposed sealed documents to the Plaintiff. (Manzer, C)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER 12 permitting pro se party, Richard Giddens, to participate in litigation as an e-filer under Local Rule 133 signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/18/2014. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giddens v. City of Suisun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Giddens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Suisun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suisun City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Bragdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suisun City Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suisun Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmond Dashido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Mattos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Urlaub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?