November 16, 2015 |
Filing
33
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/13/15 ordering that this action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
|
October 14, 2015 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/13/15 ordering this action is dismissed without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
|
August 7, 2015 |
Filing
27
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/6/15 ORDERING that the AG is requested to contact appropriate officials at the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and/or the appropriate prisons, and obtain the following info rmation for the period June 1, 2015 to the date of inquiry: (1) whether plaintiff currently has possession of all his property; (2) if not, identify the property that is not in plaintiffs possession, its current location, and an explanation for its c urrent location ; (3) whether and, if applicable, when, plaintiff will obtain possession of specific missing personal property; and (4) whether and, if applicable, why, any specific item of plaintiffs personal property has been permanently confiscate d or deemed permanently missing. Within 21 days after the filing date of this order, the AG is requested to file and serve a supplemental status report setting forth the above-requested information. Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Clerk of Court is directed to: a. Serve a copy of this order on the Office of the California Attorney General, Attention: Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica N. Anderson. b. Send plaintiff, together with a copy of this order, a blank copy of the form used by prisoners in this district to commence a civil rights action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983. (cc Monica Anderson)(Dillon, M)
|
May 21, 2015 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/20/15 ordering the office of the California Attorney General is directed to contact CDCR authorities and/or prison authorities at plaintiff's recent places of incarceration to investigate th e matters set forth above for the period 01/01/12 through the date of inquiry. The supervising deputy attorney general or designee is requested to file a status report with the court and serve a copy of the report on the plaintiff within 14 days aft er the filing date of this order. Plaintiff may file his proposed second amended complaint on or before 06/26/15. The clerk of the court is directed to: Redesignate on the docket at 17 that the matter filed is a notice. Redesignate on the docket at 18 that the matter is construed as a request for extension of time. Send plaintiff together with a copy of this order, the following: A copy of the court's order filed 04/22/15 16 . A copy of plaintiff's first amended complaint [15 ]. A copy of plaintiff's original complaint 1 ; and a blank copy of the form used by prisoners in this district to commence a civil rights action pursuant to 42 USC 1983. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Monica Anderson, Supervising Attorney General. (cc: Monica Anderson, Attorney General) (Plummer, M) Modified on 5/21/2015 (Plummer, M).
|
April 22, 2015 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/21/15 ORDERING that plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to file a Second Amended Complaint within 30 days; plaintiff's 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (Benson, A)
|
December 24, 2014 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/23/14 granting 11 Motion, construed as a second extension of time to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is permitted one final opportunity to amend his complaint but must do so within 30 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
|
September 19, 2014 |
Filing
7
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Robert Edward Dahl, Jr. signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/18/2014. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and for ward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
|
April 22, 2014 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/21/2014 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
|